Epoch Group Inc v. Los Angeles Magazine, LLC
Plaintiff: Epoch Group Inc doing business as Epoch Media Group
Defendant: Los Angeles Magazine, - and Los Angeles Magazine, LLC
Petitioner: Epoch Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv04680
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND RETRACTION #19 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court makes the following Order: 1. Defendant Los Angeles Magazine, and any agent acting on its behalf, shall be permanently enjoined from posting, publishing, printing, or in any other way presenting the article "Inside the Shadowy World of Shen Yun and Its Secret Pro-Trump Ties," which was published in its March, 2020 issue. 2. This shall be deemed a worldwide injunction binding on Los Angeles Magazine, its parent company, its subsidiaries or corporate affiliates, any website controlled by the foregoing, and any agent acting on their behalf. 3. This Court shall have continuing jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing theinjunction. 4. The above entitled matter is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, but without prejudice to any action to enforce this Order. All attorneys' fees, costs of court, and expenses will be borne by each party incurring the same. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bakes, Christopher)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan P. Sugar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc and designating Christopher J Bakes as local counsel #17 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan P. Sugar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/2/2020, Receipt No. 26658357) filed by plaintiff Epoch Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bakes, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Order for Doc 12 Application on Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): Order should be as an attachment to PHV application and not submitted as a separate document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan P. Sugar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc #12 by Clerk. Docket No. #12 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #14 filed on June 3, 2020. (lom)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan P. Sugar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26658357) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed Order is to be attached to application and not submitted as a separate document. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Order for Doc 12 Application on Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by plaintiff Epoch Group Inc. (Bakes, Christopher)
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 15 - First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan P. Sugar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26658357) filed by plaintiff Epoch Group Inc. (Bakes, Christopher) Modified on 6/4/2020 (lom).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Magazine, LLC. (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan P. Sugar. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caitlin E Higgins counsel for Movant Epoch Group Inc. Adding Caitlin E. Higgins as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Epoch Media Group. (Attorney Caitlin E Higgins added to party Epoch Group Inc(pty:mov))(Higgins, Caitlin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Corporate Disclosure Statement re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Movant Epoch Group Inc (Bakes, Christopher)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc, (Bakes, Christopher)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc. (Bakes, Christopher)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Epoch Group Inc. (Bakes, Christopher)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26569791 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Epoch Group Inc. (Attorney Christopher J Bakes added to party Epoch Group Inc(pty:mov))(Bakes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epoch Group Inc v. Los Angeles Magazine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Magazine, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Magazine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Epoch Group Inc
Represented By: Caitlin E Higgins
Represented By: Christopher J Bakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epoch Group Inc doing business as Epoch Media Group
Represented By: Caitlin E Higgins
Represented By: Christopher J Bakes
Represented By: Bryan P Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?