G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Rafael Torres
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Rafael A Torres
Case Number: 2:2020cv04721
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #9 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. (shb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Riley, Thomas)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rafael A Torres. (jtil)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Related Group Control Number is CV 10-00128-WDK(JCx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jtil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, (Riley, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26586288 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Rafael Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael A Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?