Kay Nee v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Kay Nee
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv04741
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kay Nee, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 6/8/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz, Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to illegible signature and no title given. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to reception area, no signature or title given. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lewis, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-4741 MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 Text Only Entry - In Chambers - Pursuant to Order of the Chief Judge No. 20-074, this action is stayed. The deadlines set by the Case Management Order (ECF No. 9) are suspended until the stay is lifted. It is so ordered. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. *See order for details.* (Attachments: #1 Statement of Consent CV-11) (es)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Kay Nee. (Lewis, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (es)
May 31, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 , Summons Request #5 filed by Plaintiff Kay Nee. (Lewis, James)
May 31, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 filed by Plaintiff Kay Nee. (Lewis, James)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Request was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events > Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Summons Request.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed under separate events, not as attachments to the complaint. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26597990 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kay Nee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Summons, #3 Declaration Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney James B Lewis added to party Kay Nee(pty:pla))(Lewis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay Nee v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Nee
Represented By: James B Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?