The PLS.com, LLC v. The National Association of Realtors et al
Plaintiff: The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company and The PLS.com, LLC
Defendant: Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC, Bright MLS, Inc., The National Association of Realtors and California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04790
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 46 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bright MLS, Inc., California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc., Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC, The National Association of Realtors amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC(Commerson, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc. (Hicks, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc., identifying Chubb, Ltd and Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attorney Robert J Hicks added to party California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hicks, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #42 . 1. Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC ("PLS") shall file an Amended Complaint on or before July 20, 2020. 2. The parties shall meet and confer following the filing of the Amended Complaint. PLS shall inform Defendants whether it will file a Second Amended Complaint on or before August 3, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. PDT. 3. Should PLS decide to further amend the Amended Complaint after the second round of meeting and conferring, PLS may file a Second Amended Complaint on or before August 10, 2020. (mrgo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Commerson, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Wendy Qiu counsel for Defendants Bright MLS, Inc., Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC. Adding Wendy Qiu as counsel of record for Bright MLS, Inc. and Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bright MLS, Inc. and Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC. (Attorney Wendy Qiu added to party Bright MLS, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy Qiu added to party Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC(pty:dft))(Qiu, Wendy)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #37 Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Bonanno MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors, designating Robert Patrick Vance, Jr as local counsel. (et)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney William A. Burck MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors, designating Robert Patrick Vance, Jr as local counsel. (et)
July 10, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney William A. Burck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27145788) #36 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Bonanno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27145898) #37 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an APPLICATION, not a MOTION. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 9, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Bonanno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27145898) filed by Defendant The National Association of Realtors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vance, Robert)
July 9, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney William A. Burck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27145788) filed by Defendant The National Association of Realtors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vance, Robert)
July 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Patrick Vance, Jr on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors (Attorney Robert Patrick Vance, Jr added to party The National Association of Realtors(pty:dft))(Vance, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney Ashlee Aguiar APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company, designating Scott R. Commerson as local counsel. (mrgo)
July 7, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ashlee Aguiar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27108766) filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Commerson, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Brian Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bright MLS Inc, Midwest Real Estate Data, Inc, designating Jerrold Abeles as local counsel #31 . (iv)
June 30, 2020 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian D. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bright MLS, Inc., Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27021189) filed by Defendants Bright MLS, Inc., Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 MD Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Letter to the State Bar re Pro Hac Vice, #4 Proposed Order) (Abeles, Jerrold)
June 15, 2020 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher G. Renner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26707088) #19 filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Commerson, Scott)
June 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bright MLS, Inc., identifying Chubb, Ltd.. (Attorney Jerrold E Abeles added to party Bright MLS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Abeles, Jerrold)
June 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC, identifying Multiple Listing Service of Northern Illinois, Inc.. (Attorney Jerrold E Abeles added to party Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC(pty:dft))(Abeles, Jerrold)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney John F. McGrory, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The PLS.com, LLC, designating Scott R Commerson as local counsel. (lom)
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John F. McGrory, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/5/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26707241) filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. McGrory, Jr. in support of Application to Appear as Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing for John F. McGrory, Jr.), #3 Proposed Order) (Commerson, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas E. Litvack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26706752) #18 filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Commerson, Scott)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher G. Renner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company, designating Scott Commerson as local counsel. (mrgo)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: DENYING #20 Non-Resident Attorney John F. McGrory, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company for failure to attach a Certificate of Good Standing issued within 30 days prior to filing of Application. Terming Attorney John F McGrory, Jr. (yl)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas E. Litvack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company, designating Scott Commerson as local counsel. (yl)
June 5, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The National Association of Realtors answer now due 7/20/2020; Bright MLS, Inc. answer now due 7/20/2020; California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc. answer now due 7/20/2020; Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC answer now due 7/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The National Association of Realtors.(Glass, Ethan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John F. McGrory, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26707241) filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Commerson, Scott)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher G. Renner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26707088) filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Commerson, Scott)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas E. Litvack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26706752) filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Commerson, Scott)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, upon Defendant Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarah Burke, Authorized to Accept Service on behalf of Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 POS by Mail re Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC)(Commerson, Scott)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The National Association of Realtors, (Glass, Ethan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ethan C Glass on behalf of Defendant The National Association of Realtors (Attorney Ethan C Glass added to party The National Association of Realtors(pty:dft))(Glass, Ethan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, upon Defendant Bright MLS, Inc. served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc. served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020; The National Association of Realtors served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc. Kamesha James, Authorized to Accept Service for Bright MLS, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Bright MLS, Inc. Proof of Service, #2 California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc. Proof of Service)(Commerson, Scott)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John F. McGrory, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas E. Litvack. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher G. Renner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Bright MLS, Inc., California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc., Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC, The National Association of Realtors. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Bright MLS, Inc., #2 Summons as to Defendant Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC, #3 Summons as to Defendant California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc.) (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company (Commerson, Scott)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company, identifying FASP Realty, Inc., Midnight Capital, LLC, Harris Family Trust, David Parnes Living Trust, Green Collective, LLC, Sidehill Ventures, Inc.. (Commerson, Scott)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Bright MLS, Inc. Summons, #2 Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC Summons, #3 California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc. Summons)(Commerson, Scott)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Commerson, Scott)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26607517 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attorney Scott R Commerson added to party The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company(pty:pla))(Commerson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The PLS.com, LLC v. The National Association of Realtors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Real Estate Data, LLC
Represented By: Brian D Schneider
Represented By: Wendy Qiu
Represented By: Jerrold E Abeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright MLS, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D Schneider
Represented By: Wendy Qiu
Represented By: Jerrold E Abeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Association of Realtors
Represented By: Robert Patrick Vance, Jr
Represented By: William A. Burck
Represented By: Ethan C Glass
Represented By: Michael D. Bonanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Regional Multiple Listing Service, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The PLS.com, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The PLS.com, LLC
Represented By: Everett W Jack, Jr
Represented By: John F McGrory, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas E Litvack
Represented By: Christopher G Renner
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Represented By: Ashlee Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?