Marco Verch v. Elevare Skin, LLC
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: Elevare Skin, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04819
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard Liebowitz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Eastern
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:20-cv-01686-PKC-SJB, from U.S. District Court Eastern District of New York (Brooklyn). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-04819-FMO (KSx). (lh)
May 29, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Central District of California. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The #9 Stipulation to Transfer Venue is So Ordered. "District courts have the discretion to transfer a case sua sponte or on motion, consent, or stipulation of all parties under 28 U.S.C. 1404." Pager v. Metro. Edison, No. 16-CV-5161 (KAM) (RER), 2017 WL 11195551, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. May 19, 2017) (citation omitted). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. The provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York, which requires a seven-day stay of an order transferring venue, is waived. The parties' #9 joint request for an extension of time for Defendant to answer is reserved for the Court to which this matter is transferred. Upon the transfer of the case, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mark this case as closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/29/2020. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to transfer venue by Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The notice of appearance was filed by Andre Boniadi, however the Stipulation of Transfer was signed by David P. Beitchman. The parties shall either file an updated stipulation with counsel of record signatures, or Mr. Beitchman must file a notice of appearance using his PACER/ECF credentials. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/28/2020. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Boniadi on behalf of Elevare Skin, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Boniadi, Andre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: So that the Court may consider #7 the parties' stipulation to transfer venue, defense counsel shall enter a notice of appearance by June 1, 2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/27/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to transfer Venue by Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Elevare Skin, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elevare Skin, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elevare Skin, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12628517 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marco Verch v. Elevare Skin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevare Skin, LLC
Represented By: Andre Boniadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?