Larry G. Philpot v. CalNews, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: CalNews, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04824
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AUGUST 6,2020 #12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 6, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CalNews, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sager, Kelli)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-04824 ODW(KSx). (rn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CalNews, Inc. answer now due 7/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CalNews, Inc..(Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party CalNews, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sager, Kelli)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, upon Defendant CalNews, Inc. served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kristensen, John)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant CalNews, Inc. (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26621354 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party Larry G. Philpot(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry G. Philpot v. CalNews, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Ventura
Represented By: Jesenia Anahy Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CalNews, Inc.
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?