Jerry Anderson v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Jerry Anderson
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 2:2020cv04868
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and this action is dismissed without prejudice. #8 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that petitioner's voluntary dismissal of this action is GRANTED, and that Judgment be entered denying the Petition and dismissing this action without prejudice. (es)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Cormac J. Carney. Effective July 13, 2020, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9B, on the 9th floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Buiding and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Carneys Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at CJC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at the Clerks Office, Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Los Angeles or Riverside courthouses. Please refer to Judge Carneys Procedures and Schedules Page on the Courts website **UPDATED AS OF JULY 9, 2020** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to the Transfering of State Habeas Petition filed by Petitioner Jerry Anderson (es)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Jurisdiction. Petitioner is ordered to file with the court a written response to the Order to Show Cause on or beforeJuly 13, 2020 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111, #2 CV 38) (esa)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
June 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Jerry Anderson. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/29/2020. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Jerry Anderson. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Anderson v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?