Gold Value International Textile, Inc. v. Gabriel Brothers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gold Value International Textile, Inc. and Gold Value International Textile, Inc. a California Corporation, individually and doing business as Fiesta Fabric
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Iberia Fashion LLC, Hall of Fame Ltd., Gabriel Brothers, Inc. a West Virginia corporation, individually and doing business as Rugged Wearhouse and Iberia Fashion LLC a Nw York limited liability company, individually and doing business as Indero
Case Number: 2:2020cv04882
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #14 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Gabriel Brothers, Inc. shall have up to and including 8/19/2020, as the time within which to respond to the Complaint. (gk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 19, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Hall of Fame Ltd.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Hall of Fame Ltd. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rome "Doe", Agent in charge authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gabriel Brothers, Inc. answer now due 8/5/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., upon Defendant Gabriel Brothers, Inc. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, c/o Peter Cayetano - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Hall of Fame Ltd. and Iberia Fashion LLC. (jtil)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26640802 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Gold Value International Textile, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Value International Textile, Inc. v. Gabriel Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Fashion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall of Fame Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc. a West Virginia corporation, individually and doing business as Rugged Wearhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Fashion LLC a Nw York limited liability company, individually and doing business as Indero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Value International Textile, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Value International Textile, Inc. a California Corporation, individually and doing business as Fiesta Fabric
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?