621 Two, LLC v. Leggett and Platt, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: 621 TWO, LLC, as successor in interest to 621, LLC and 621 Two, LLC
Defendant: LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: James DeRoche
Case Number: 2:2020cv04883
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that James DeRoche may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff 621 Two, LLC(Cooper, Carey)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENIED AS MOOT ON DEFENDANT LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #13 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (lom)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 26, 2021. See order for details. (lom)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT, THE FOLLOWING RULES SHALL APPLY. See order for details. (lom)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on August 10, 2020 is VACATED, and the following dates are hereby set. Please review the Court's trial order for further details. Dates / Deadlines: Last Day to Add Parties & Amend Pleadings (Doe defendants are dismissed as of cut-off to add parties) 9/10/20; Discovery Cut-Off: 2/16/21; Last Day to File Motion: 3/02/21; Opening Expert Witness Disclosure [See F.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)] 2/23/21; Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure: 3/23/21; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 4/13/21; Final Pretrial Conference (2:30 p.m.): 5/10/21; Jury Trial (9:00 a.m.): 5/25/21. (lom)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST for Leave of Derek W. Paradis to Appear for Telephonic Appearance at Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. Request set for hearing on 8/10/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Paradis, Derek)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Appear, #11 filed by Defendant Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Paradis, Derek)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Leave of Derek W. Paradis to Appear for Telephonic at Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. Request set for hearing on 8/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Paradis, Derek)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT RULE 26 REPORT OF THE PARTIES REPORT of Rule 26 Report filed by Defendant Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Peterson, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 621 Two, LLC, identifying Plaintiff 621 Two, LLC as successor in interest to 621, LLC - and - Defendant Leggett & Platt, Incorporated. (Cooper, Carey)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (pbl)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
June 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/28/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
June 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Leggett and Platt, Incorporated. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff 621 Two, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Peterson, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED, identifying The Vanguard Group, State Street Corporation, BlackRock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Peterson, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Peterson, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20CMCV00101 Receipt No: ACACDC-26640830 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek W. Paradis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Shonna Koch, #5 Proof of Service) (Attorney James M Peterson added to party LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED(pty:dft))(Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 621 Two, LLC v. Leggett and Platt, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 621 TWO, LLC, as successor in interest to 621, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 621 Two, LLC
Represented By: Carey L Cooper
Represented By: Michele J Bongiovanni
Represented By: Christopher Michael Milas
Represented By: Michele Jeanette Bongiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEGGETT & PLATT, INCORPORATED
Represented By: James M Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leggett and Platt, Incorporated
Represented By: Derek W Paradis
Represented By: James M Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: James DeRoche
Represented By: James D DeRoche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?