Matthew Pristave v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Pristave
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv04892
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Pristave. (Barry, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition 10 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Pristave. (Barry, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Matthew Pristave. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Barry, David)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
June 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/29/2020, attached as Exhibit C.(jtil)
June 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Matthew Pristave in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/27/2020, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV15885 Receipt No: ACACDC-26652854 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Pristave v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Pristave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?