Patrick Nazemi v. The Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Nazemi
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as trustee for the certificate holders of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-I, Real Time Resolutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, MTC Financial Inc. and Does 1-20 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv05003
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal from Superior Court. (et)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 20STCV15757. (lc)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT #13 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Stipulation is APPROVED. This action is remanded to the LosAngeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV15757. In light of this remand, Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint #8 is MOOT.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Real Time Resolutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Remand)(Warner, Steven)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (cw)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DKT. #8 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from January 4, 2021 to November 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Nazemi. of Objection to Non-Monetary Status of MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps. (Tym, Ronald)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #8 filed by Defendants Real Time Resolutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Deed of Trust), #2 Exhibit B (Assignment of DOT), #3 Exhibit C (Recorded Substitution of Trustee), #4 Exhibit D (Notice of Default))(Warner, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Real Time Resolutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Warner, Steven)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
June 8, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, inclusive, MTC Financial Inc., Real Time Resolutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Patrick Nazemi. Filed in State Court on 4/24/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. identifying Real Time Resolutions Inc., a Texas Corporation, is located in Dallas, TX, and is wholly owned by Real Time Group, Inc., a Nevada corporation. as Corporate Parent. (Warner, Steven)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as trustee for the certificate holders of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-I identifying The Bank of New York Mellon, a New York State banking institution with its principal place of business in New York, is wholly owned by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, a publicly traded company. as Corporate Parent. (Warner, Steven)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Real Time Resolutions, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as trustee for the certificate holders of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-I. (Warner, Steven)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV15757 Receipt No: ACACDC-26700519 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as trustee for the certificate holders of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-I, Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (state court complaint), #2 Exhibit (trustees declaratrion), #3 Exhibit (OSC)) (Attorney Steven P Warner added to party Real Time Resolutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven P Warner added to party The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as trustee for the certificate holders of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-I(pty:dft))(Warner, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Nazemi v. The Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as trustee for the certificate holders of CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-I
Represented By: Steven P Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven P Warner
Represented By: Abraham J Colman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Steven P Warner
Represented By: Abraham J Colman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Nazemi
Represented By: Ronald D Tym
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?