UK Grid Solutions Limited v. Singapore Airlines Limited et al
Petitioner: UK Grid Solutions Limited, F.H. Bertling Logistics GMBH and Singapore Airlines Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv05006
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Defendant Singapore Airlines Limited.. (Cunningham, Scott)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff UK Grid Solutions Limited, upon Defendant Singapore Airlines Limited served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Chapman, Agent for Service by Serving Deirdre Squires in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Adam)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for August 13, 2020, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 30, 2020. (iv)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Singapore Airlines Limited, identifying parent Temasek Holdings (Private) Limited. (Attorney Justin M Schmidt added to party Singapore Airlines Limited(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Singapore Airlines Limited identifying Temasek Holdings (Private) Limited as Corporate Parent. (Cunningham, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by defendant Singapore Airlines Limited.(Attorney Scott D Cunningham added to party Singapore Airlines Limited(pty:dft))(Cunningham, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants F.H. Bertling Logistics GMBH, Singapore Airlines Limited. (car)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff UK Grid Solutions Limited, identifying General Electric Company. (Brown, Adam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant UK Grid Solutions Limited. (Brown, Adam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff UK Grid Solutions Limited. (Brown, Adam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26701317 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff UK Grid Solutions Limited. (Attorney Adam C Brown added to party UK Grid Solutions Limited(pty:bkmov))(Brown, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UK Grid Solutions Limited v. Singapore Airlines Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UK Grid Solutions Limited
Represented By: Adam C Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: F.H. Bertling Logistics GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Singapore Airlines Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?