Delia Gonzales et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Gonzales and Delia Gonzales
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc., Los Angeles Rubber Company, Seariver Maritime, Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Chevron Shipping Company LLC, Moore McCormack Resources, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Southern California Gas Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, First Doe, O.G. Supply, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Astra Flooring Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, SL Services, Inc., Chevron, U.S.A., Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Trane U.S. Inc., ITT Corporation, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., National Bulk Carriers, Inc., Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, FMC Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., American President Lines, Ltd., Matson Navigation Company, -, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Allied Signal Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Shelby Battersby and Company, Peerless Pump Co., Inc., Viacom, Inc., Todd Shipyards Corporation and Chicago Pump Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05021
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 112 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV15855, acknowledged on 6/25/2020. (iv)
June 23, 2020 Filing 111 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO REMAND ACTION TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge John F. Walter. The parties, by and through their attorneys of record, hereby stipulate that Metalclad shall, and hereby does, withdraw its Notice of Removal, and stipulate and agree that this action to be immediately remanded to the Los Angeles Superior Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
June 22, 2020 Filing 109 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #77 Order to Show Cause Re Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 22, 2020 Filing 108 Corrected STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation to Remand Action to Los Angeles Superior Court - Corrected (to correct Judge))(Gold, Roger)
June 22, 2020 Filing 107 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales Declaration of Roger E. Gold In Response to Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp and SeaRiver Maritime Inc Motion to Dismiss re: Declaration (Motion related) #105 (Gold, Roger)
June 22, 2020 Filing 106 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales re: Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court, #104 (Gold, Roger)
June 22, 2020 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Roger E. Gold In Response to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Seariver Maritime, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation #52 filed by Plaintiffs Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. (Gold, Roger)
June 22, 2020 Filing 104 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Remand Action)(Attorney Roger E Gold added to party Jerry Gonzales(pty:pla))(Gold, Roger)
June 19, 2020 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Robert H. Baronian Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Baronian, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Stephen C. Klausen Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Chevron Shipping Company LLC. (Klausen, Stephen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Stephen C. Klausen Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Chevron, U.S.A., Inc.. (Klausen, Stephen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Jessica S. Kim re Order #12 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Southern California Gas Company. (Kim, Jessica)
June 19, 2020 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Anthony S. Miller ;DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company. (Cormier, Jennifer)
June 18, 2020 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Mary T. McKelvey Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (McKelvey, Mary)
June 18, 2020 Filing 97 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales Proof of Service re Roger E. Gold Declaration in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions re: Declaration, #91 (Gold, Roger)
June 18, 2020 Filing 96 DECLARATION of W. Joseph Gunter LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Barba, Luis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 95 DECLARATION of Luis A. Barba LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Barba, Luis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 94 DECLARATION of W. Joseph Gunter LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Barba, Luis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Luis A. Barba LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Barba, Luis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney E Reno Cross added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cross, E)
June 18, 2020 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Roger E. Gold re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #78 Declaration of Roger E. Gold in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions filed by Plaintiffs Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. (Gold, Roger)
June 18, 2020 Filing 90 DECLARATION of D. David Steele LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.. (Yaron, George)
June 18, 2020 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Patrick J. Foley LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Wang, Galen)
June 18, 2020 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 18, 2020 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT OR OTHERWISE PLEAD #22 by Judge John F. Walter. APL shall have until July 10, 2020 to answer or otherwise plead. (iv)
June 17, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Attorney Carla Lynn Crochet added to party Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Crochet, Carla)
June 17, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Trane U.S. Inc. (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party Trane U.S. Inc.(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
June 17, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen C Klausen on behalf of Defendant Chevron, U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney Stephen C Klausen added to party Chevron, U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Klausen, Stephen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
June 17, 2020 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chevron Shipping Company LLC identifying Chevron U.S.A. Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 17, 2020 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Chevron Shipping Company LLC.(Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Chevron Shipping Company LLC(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
June 17, 2020 Filing 79 Text Entry Order: Defendant American President Lines, Ltd.sMotion to Dismiss (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)) filed on June 11, 2020 (Docket No. #46 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiffs' counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by June 19, 2020, why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $1,500.00 for their violations of the Court's Standing Order and Local Rule 7-3. (iv)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge John F. Walter. MetalClad and Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than June 22, 2020, why this Court has subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the remand of this action. (iv)
June 12, 2020 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron L. Britton counsel for Defendants Armstrong International, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. Adding Aaron L. Britton as counsel of record for Armstrong International, Inc. and Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. and Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attorney Aaron L. Britton added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron L. Britton added to party Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Britton, Aaron)
June 12, 2020 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Adding Tina L. Baravarian as counsel of record for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian added to party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Baravarian, Tina)
June 12, 2020 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Katherine C. Elford as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc.. (Elford, Katherine)
June 12, 2020 Filing 73 Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT (May 27, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #35 .) (iv)
June 11, 2020 Filing 72 Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company's Notice of Appearance of Jennifer A. Cormier (Miller, Anthony)
June 11, 2020 Filing 71 Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company's Notice of Appearance of Anthony S. Miller (Miller, Anthony)
June 11, 2020 Filing 70 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons re: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #69 (Miller, Anthony)
June 11, 2020 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company.(Attorney Anthony Sinclair Miller added to party A.W. Chesterton Company(pty:dft))(Miller, Anthony)
June 11, 2020 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Bobbie R. Bailey as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 67 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary Therese McKelvey counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding Stephen M. Nichols as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (McKelvey, Mary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary Therese McKelvey counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding Mary T. McKelvey as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (McKelvey, Mary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary Therese McKelvey counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (McKelvey, Mary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, identifying DowDuPont Inc.. (McKelvey, Mary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE LETTER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF DELIA GONZALES filed by Plaintiff Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. TO BE CONTINUED (Gold, Roger)
June 11, 2020 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc., identifying SeaRiver Financial Holdings, Inc. and Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attorney Jayme C Long added to party Seariver Maritime, Inc.(pty:dft))(Long, Jayme)
June 11, 2020 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation, identifying None. (Attorney Jayme C Long added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft))(Long, Jayme)
June 11, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COURT ORDER filed by Plaintiff Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. (Gold, Roger)
June 11, 2020 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, Seariver Maritime, Inc.. (Long, Jayme)
June 11, 2020 Filing 58 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Barba, Luis)
June 11, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc..(Attorney Luis Alfonso Barba added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barba, Luis)
June 11, 2020 Filing 56 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. (Barba, Luis)
June 11, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc..(Attorney Luis Alfonso Barba added to party Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Barba, Luis)
June 11, 2020 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Seariver Maritime, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation filed by Defendants Seariver Maritime, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Samantha E Fahr added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha E Fahr added to party Seariver Maritime, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Fahr, Samantha)
June 11, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc..(Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Joseph Duffy - Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT Corporation. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant ITT Corporation.(Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company.(Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC.(Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 46 *STRICKEN* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss American President Lines, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Affidavit) (Port, Andrew) Modified on 6/17/2020 (sr).
June 11, 2020 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chevron, U.S.A., Inc. identifying Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 11, 2020 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ITT Corporation identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Chevron, U.S.A., Inc..(Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Chevron, U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
June 11, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., identifying Terra Millennium Corporation; Firemans Fund Insurance Co./Allianz/Enstar; Resolute Management; and RiverStone.. (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 11, 2020 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Goulds Pumps LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT Corporation. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; ITT LCC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Goulds Pumps LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT Corporation(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc..(Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chiu, Sylvia)
June 11, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Goulds Pumps LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT Corporation. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; ITT LCC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Goulds Pumps LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT Corporation(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC.(Chiu, Sylvia)
June 11, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Galen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 34 DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANYS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES - CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, identifying The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and BlackRock, Inc.. (Attorney Galen Bo Chuan Wang added to party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Wang, Galen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation.(Attorney Mary Therese McKelvey added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(McKelvey, Mary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., identifying The Carlyle Group, Miles Marine, Inc., Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., and Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Yaron, George)
June 11, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jessica S Kim counsel for Defendant Southern California Gas Company. Adding Jessica S. Kim as counsel of record for Southern California Gas Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Southern California Gas Company. (Kim, Jessica)
June 11, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc..(Attorney George D Yaron added to party Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yaron, George)
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc., identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and Imo Holdings, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 STATEMENT Re: Attempts to Meet and Confer Prior to Filing Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P., 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, Seariver Maritime, Inc. (Fahr, Samantha)
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southern California Gas Company, identifying Sempra Energy. (Kim, Jessica)
June 11, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Southern California Gas Company identifying Sempra Energy as Corporate Parent. (Kim, Jessica)
June 11, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Southern California Gas Company.(Attorney Jessica S Kim added to party Southern California Gas Company(pty:dft))(Kim, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American President Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Port, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Attorney Andrew I Port added to party American President Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Port, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Andrew I. Port filed by Defendant American President Lines, Ltd.. (Port, Andrew)
June 9, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc (FILED IN STATE COURT (May 18, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #13 .) (iv)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 13, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 29, 2020. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the Scheduling Conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the Scheduling Conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (lc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Trane U.S. Inc. identifying Trane Technologies plc as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Trane U.S. Inc..(Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Trane U.S. Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-05021 JFW(PJWx). (rn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Plaintiff Delia Gonzales filed by Plaintiff Delia Gonzales, Jerry Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Letter Letter to All Counsel re Notice of Plaintiff's Deposition)(Pearce, Timothy)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Patrick J. Walsh. New Case Number 2:20-cv-05021 RGK (PJWx). (jtil)
June 4, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jerry Gonzales and Delia Gonzales in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/24/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC identifying no parent corporations as Corporate Parent. (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying ENTRX LLC (Holding Company). (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1441, 1446 filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Chiu, Sylvia)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV15855 Receipt No: ACACDC-26692310 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sylvia Chiu in Support of Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1441, 1446) (Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Chiu, Sylvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delia Gonzales et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seariver Maritime, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha E Fahr
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Shipping Company LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Stephen C Klausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore McCormack Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Represented By: Aaron L. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Gas Company
Represented By: Kendra Bray
Represented By: Jessica S Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Anthony Sinclair Miller
Represented By: Jennifer A Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.G. Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Flooring Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Galen Bo Chuan Wang
Represented By: Tina Ladan Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Stephen C Klausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Represented By: Aaron L. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Wood
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: E Reno Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Represented By: George D Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American President Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Morris
Represented By: Andrew I Port
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Samantha E Fahr
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Mary Therese McKelvey
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Kenneth B Prindle
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal Inc.
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Battersby and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Shipyards Corporation
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Represented By: George D Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pump Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gonzales
Represented By: Roger E Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Gonzales
Represented By: Roger Edward Gold
Represented By: Cecil B. Crain
Represented By: Roger E Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?