In Re: Antoine R. Chamoun
Appellant: Antoine R. Chamoun
Debtor: T and J Flooring and Design, Tony Chamoun and D and J Flooring and Design
Appellee: David Seror
Case Number: 2:2020cv05069
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Designation of Record on Appeal #10 , for the following reasons: Document is to be filed in the Bankruptcy Court. (et)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 8/4/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #11 ] - DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Appellant Antoine R. Chamoun (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Filing)(Brownstein, William) Modified on 8/4/2020 (et).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: Court's Order to Show Cause [DE #7 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This Court's OSC is discharged. Appellant shall file the Statement of Issues on Appeal and Designation of Record with the Bankruptcy Court by 7/27/2020. Briefing will take place following this Court's receipt of notice that the Bankruptcy Record is complete in accordance with the schedule set fo1th in Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018(a). (jp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 OPPOSITION filed by In re Debtor Antoine R. Chamoun, Appellant Antoine R. Chamoun. (Attorney William H Brownstein added to party Antoine R. Chamoun(pty:db))(Brownstein, William)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court, on its own motion, orders appellant to show cause in writing on or before 7/20/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (jp)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO USDC, Central District of California regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jp)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 6/5/2020. (lh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ELECTION that Appeal be Heard in the United States District Court filed by Appellee David Seror electing to transfer the Appeal to the District Court. (lh)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Denying the Debtor's Motion to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 entered on 5/07/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Victoria S. Kaufman, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 5/20/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:18-bk-11620-VK, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC-20-1121., filed by Appellant Antoine R. Chamoun. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Antoine R. Chamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Antoine R. Chamoun
Represented By: William H Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: T and J Flooring and Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Tony Chamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: D and J Flooring and Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Seror
Represented By: Steven T Gubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?