Ana Sanchez v. FCA US, LLC
Plaintiff: Ana Sanchez
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05119
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case Number: 20STCV17358. (jp)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The action is hereby REMANDED to State Court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Ana Sanchez. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth Quinn ISO Motion for Remand) (Attorney Elizabeth Quinn added to party Ana Sanchez(pty:pla)) (Quinn, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/28/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
June 9, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/03/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
June 9, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ana Sanchez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/06/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV17358 Receipt No: ACACDC-26742793 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ana Sanchez v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?