Daisy Castillo v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daisy Castillo
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv05124
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc, designating Autumm E Lewis as local counsel. (jp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The scheduling conference is held telephonically. The Court directs counsel for all "personal injury" plaintiffs (i.e., all above-captioned plaintiffs except for plaintiffs in the Lomas action) to meet and confer and file a joint report by 8/10/2020. The August 10 joint report shall address the selection of liaison counsel as well as lead counsel for the purposes of discovery only (if any). If an agreement is not reached, the joint report shall include a proposed process pursuant to which the Court would designate such counsel. Assuming that agreed upon liaison counsel are identified in the August 10 report, all counsel shall meet and confer and file a joint report by August 24, 2020 that sets forth the parties respective and/or collective as to an efficient discovery process. The Court consolidates the cases for pretrial purposes. Case No. LA CV20-00786 JAK (SKx) Frankie Lomas, et al. v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al. is designated the LEAD CASE. All future filings shall be made in the docket of the Lead Case only as follows: All documents filed in this consolidation action shall bear the following caption. Case Nos. LA CV20-02089 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-03116 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-04424 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-04509 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-05124 JAK (SKx), and LA CV20-06182 JAK (SKx) are ordered administratively closed. Counsel shall refrain from filing any documents in the related/consolidated case(s) as of the date of this Order. All filings are to be made in the Lead Case only. In light of the consolidation of the cases for pretrial purposes, the Court waives the requirement for counsel to file pro hac vice applications in each of the underlying cases until the reopening of an individual case for the purpose of trial, if any. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27350563) filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING A TELEPHONIC HEARING FOR THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND CHANGING THE TIME by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Scheduling Conference set for July 27, 2020 will proceed by telephone only. No in-person appearances will be allowed. Additionally, on the Court's own motion, the TIME of the conference is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. The Deputy Clerk will email telephonic instructions to counsel of record on or before Friday, July 24, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial tbd, filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc... (Lewis, Autumn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jp)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JOINT REPORT FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #14 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Scheduling Conference in this matter has been set for July 27, 2020 (Dkt. #14 ), to be held along with the Scheduling Conference in all related actions. To serve judicial and party efficiency and to expedite review, counsel in this action are ordered to confer with the parties in the related actions: 2:20-cv-00786-JAK-SK (Lomas); 20-cv-03116-JAK-SK (Cotton); 2:20-cv-02089-JAK-SK (Barajas); 2:20-cv-04424-JAK-SK (Garcia); and 2:20-cv-04509-JAK-SK (Thomas) in preparing the Joint Report. An identical report shall be filed in each action no later than July 20, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eth) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/20/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (cw)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Sutherland, Kevin)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE AND VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. In light of the transfer of this case to the docket of Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2020 before Judge John F. Walter is vacated. The case number now reads: 2:20-cv-05124-JAK-SK. Counsel are reminded to ensure that the initials JAK are included on all future filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-00786 JAK(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson and Judge John F. Walter to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05124 JAK(SKx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 13, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 29, 2020. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. See minute order for details. (lom)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis on behalf of Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
June 9, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Daisy Castillo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/30/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., identifying Delta Air Lines, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Air Lines, Inc.:Aero Assurance Ltd.;Air4 Passenger Service Systems, LLC;DAL Europe C.V.;DAL Foreign Holdings, C.V.;DAL Global Technology Hub LLP;DAL Leasing Limited;Delta Air Lines and Pan American World Airways;Unterstutzungskasse GMBH;Delta Air Lines Dublin Limited;Delta Air Lines Private Limited;Delta Flight Products, LLC;Delta Gift Cards, Inc.;Delta India Investments I, LLC;Delta India Investments II, LLC;Delta International Aircraft Leasing Limited;Delta Material Services, LLC;Delta Professional Services, LLC;Delta Receivables, LLC;Delta Sky Club, Inc.;Delta TATL UK Limited;Delta Vacations, LLC;DL International Enterprises, LLC;DL Investment Partners, LP;Endeavor Air, Inc.;Epsilon Trading, LLC;MIPC, LLC;Monroe Energy, LLC;Montana Enterprises, Inc.;New Sky, Ltd.;NW Red Baron LLC;TATL Services BV;Various insurance underwriters in the insurance market; and Plaintiff Daisy Castillo. (Lewis, Autumn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lewis, Autumn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV16532 Receipt No: ACACDC-26744670 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Autumn Elizabeth Lewis added to party Delta Air Lines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lewis, Autumn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daisy Castillo v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Castillo
Represented By: Neama Rahmani
Represented By: Shawn Siavash Rokni
Represented By: Houman Sayaghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Autumn Elizabeth Lewis
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?