Michael Igelido v. Brian Mariotti et al
Plaintiff: Michael Igelido
Defendant: Funko, Inc, Michael Lunsford, Brian Mariotti, Adam Kriger, Diane Irvine, Russell Nickel, Gino Dellomo, Ken Brotman, Charles Denson, Jennifer Jung, Sarah Levy, Jennifer Fall Jung and Sarah Kirshbaum Levy
Case Number: 2:2020cv05177
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, ACCEPTING SERVICE, AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) The Joint Stipulation Consolidating Related Actions, Accepting Service, and Appointing Co-Lead having been considered, and good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ordered that: 1. The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial, under Case No. 2:20-cv-03740-VAP-PJW (the "Consolidated Action"): Franco Cassella, et al. v. Brian Mariotti, et al. 2:20-cv-03740-VAP-PJW, Amber Evans v. Brian Mariotti, et al. 2:20-cv-05001-VAP-PJW, Michael Igelido v. Brian Mariotti, et al. 2:20-cv-05177-VAP-PJW (see document for further details) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) Modified on 7/8/2020 (bm).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-02319 VAP(PJWx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05177 VAP(PJWx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Michael Igelido. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-03740- VAP-PJW, 2:20-cv-05001-VAP-PJW (Moest, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy William Brown APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Igelido, designating Robert C Moest as local counsel. (et)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Igelido (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26837498) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Igelido (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26837498) filed by plaintiff Michael Igelido. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moest, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Jennifer Fall Jung, Adam Kriger, Sarah Kirshbaum Levy, Michael Lunsford, Brian Mariotti, Russell Nickel. (iv)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Michael Igelido. (Moest, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Igelido. (Moest, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Michael Igelido, identifying Funko, Inc.. (Moest, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Michael Igelido. (Moest, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Igelido. (Moest, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-26764350 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Michael Igelido. (Attorney Robert C Moest added to party Michael Igelido(pty:pla))(Moest, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Igelido v. Brian Mariotti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funko, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mariotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Nickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino Dellomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Brotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Fall Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kirshbaum Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Igelido
Represented By: Robert C Moest
Represented By: Timothy William Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?