Mihaly Harisis v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mihaly Harisis
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv05210
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION CLAIMS AND REMAND TO STATE COURT #22 by Judge John F. Walter. The class claims herein are dismissed without prejudice. This matter is remanded to the Los Angeles Superior Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Mihaly Harisis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service)(De La Rosa, Kristina)
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Individuals Likely to Have Discoverable Information; Categories and Locations of Documents, Data Compilations, and Tangible Things that May be Used to Support Claims or Defenses; Computation of Damages Claimed by Disclosing Party; and Insurance Agreement Covering Liability filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Knopp, Gregory)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 8/27/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on July 13, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 5, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 9, 2021. (iv)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days (3-4 weeks, if class certification is granted), filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.. (Knopp, Gregory)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT Joint Statement Regarding Conference of Counsel Under Local Rule 7-3 For Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Knopp, Gregory)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mihaly Harisis, identifying Mihaly Harisis and Putative Class Members. (De La Rosa, Kristina)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Kristina De La Rosa re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 filed by Plaintiff Mihaly Harisis. (De La Rosa, Kristina)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Order Setting Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Mihaly Harisis. (De La Rosa, Kristina)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents to Supplement to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Summons), #3 Exhibit 2 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Complaint), #4 Exhibit 3 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Amended Summons), #5 Exhibit 4 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (First Amended Complaint), #6 Exhibit 5 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Civil Case Cover Sheet), #7 Exhibit 6 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum), #8 Exhibit 7 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Notice of Case Assignment), #9 Exhibit 8 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Answer to First Amended Complaint), #10 Exhibit 9 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Notice of Order Deeming Case Complex), #11 Exhibit 10 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Minute Order), #12 Exhibit 11 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Certificate of Mailing), #13 Exhibit 12 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Proof of Service of Summons), #14 Exhibit 13 to Supplement to Notice of Removal (Notice to Adverse Parties))(Knopp, Gregory)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Gregory W. Knopp , Lead Trial Counsel, Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Knopp, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Notice and Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice and Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court)(Knopp, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Notice to Parties and Counsel of Court's Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice to Parties and Counsel of Standing Order)(Knopp, Gregory)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter.Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 13, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, includin the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 1, 2020. (iv)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Parties and Counsel of Notice of Assignment filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice to Parties and Counsel of Notice of Assignment)(Knopp, Gregory)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
June 11, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mihaly Harisis, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agents for Service by leaving with Kaitlyn Mannix, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/22/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H, PAGE 126) (ghap)
June 11, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D, PAGE 93)(ghap)
June 11, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Starbucks Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Mihaly Harisis. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/13/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, 31) (ghap)
June 11, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Starbucks Corporation. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Mihaly Harisis. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A, PAGE 3) (ghap)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Mihaly Harisis and Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Knopp, Gregory)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Knopp, Gregory)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV11290 Receipt No: ACACDC-26777555 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory W. Knopp in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(2), 1441, 1446, and 1453, #2 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit C (Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Case Assignment), #5 Exhibit D (Answer to First Amended Complaint), #6 Exhibit E.(PAGA Letter), #7 Exhibit F (Notice of Orders Deeming Case Complex and Setting Initial Status Conference), #8 Exhibit G (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action), #9 Exhibit H (Proof of Service of Summons), #10 Declaration of Sarah Rogers in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(2), 1441, 1446, and 1453, #11 Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal and Supporting Documents) (Attorney Gregory W Knopp added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Knopp, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mihaly Harisis v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mihaly Harisis
Represented By: Emil Davtyan
Represented By: Michael D Singer
Represented By: Kristina Alicia De La Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gregory W Knopp
Represented By: Jonathan P Slowik
Represented By: Laura L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?