Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. et al v. Tilray, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Vazquez, III, Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. and Trimax Corporation
Defendant: Left Coast Ventures, Inc., Tilray, Inc., Equitable Transitions Inc, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Privateer Evolution LLC, Hugo Saavedra, William Downes, Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Debra Saavedra and Privateer Evolution, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05263
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
2 Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 92 ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,, #58 Answer of Tilray Inc., Privateer Holdings Inc. and Privateer Evolution, LLC to Amended Verified Complaint filed by Defendants Privateer Evolution, LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc..(Attorney John A Goldmark added to party Privateer Evolution, LLC(pty:dft))(Goldmark, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 91 ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,, #58 Answer of Left Coast Ventures, Inc., EKO Holdings, LLC and Brett Cummings to Amended Verified Complaint filed by Defendants Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc..(Geher, Thomas)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #88 Non-Resident Attorney John A. Goldmark APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Tilray, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc., and Privateer Evolution, LLC, designating Nicole Phillis as local counsel. (mrgo)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #87 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren B. Rainwater APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Tilray, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc., and Privateer Evolution, LLC, designating Nicole Phillis as local counsel. (mrgo)
June 23, 2020 Filing 88 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John A. Goldmark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Privateer Evolution LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/23/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26925199) filed by Defendants Privateer Evolution LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Phillis, Nicole)
June 23, 2020 Filing 87 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren B. Rainwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Privateer Evolution LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26925048) filed by Defendants Privateer Evolution LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Phillis, Nicole)
June 23, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole Phillis on behalf of Defendants Privateer Evolution LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Privateer Evolution LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Privateer Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Tilray, Inc.(pty:dft))(Phillis, Nicole)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 10/22/2020. Setting Motion Cut-off date of 12/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been reassigned to this Court's calendar for all further proceedings. The Court adopts the discovery cut-off date initially set in the January 31, 2020 Minute Order, as well as the trial date set in the January 31, 2020 Minute Order. (See Dkt. No. #36 .) Consistent with the Court's ordinary procedures, the Court otherwise adopts the dates listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. (lom)
June 18, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Thomas Michael Geher on behalf of Defendants Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is a licensed California attorney, admitted to this Court, is currently Active and in good standing. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 18, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Thomas Michael Geher on behalf of Defendant EKO Holdings LLC. RE: 74. PHV fee N/A. (Geher, Thomas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 83 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for July 20, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. (lom)
June 17, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Paul Joseph Battista on behalf of Defendant Left Coast Ventures, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 17, 2020 Filing 79 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney William Barry Blum on behalf of Defendant Left Coast Ventures, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
June 17, 2020 Filing 77 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Brian W. Toth on behalf of Defendants Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 17, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Freddy Funes on behalf of Defendants Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05263 PA(AFMx). (rn)
June 16, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M Geher on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Joseph Battista on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William Barry Blum on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian W Toth on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Rainwater on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John Goldmark on behalf of Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Freddy Funes on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Pedro Alejandro Gonzalez on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
June 16, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:19-cv-25019-AHS, from Southern District of Florida (Miami). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-05263 CBM (AFMx). (ghap)
June 15, 2020 Filing 64 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Florida Southern
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #58 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Venue by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion, Re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #58 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Privateer Evolution, LLC, Brett Cummings, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc., Privateer Evolution LLC, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc. Responses due by 6/11/2020 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/1/2020. (AHS) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 60 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #58 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Change Venue by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc., Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III. (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #58 Amended Complaint,, , MOTION to Change Venue by Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc., Privateer Evolution LLC, Privateer Evolution, LLC, Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dara Redler, #2 Declaration of Patrick Moen, #3 Declaration of Brett Cummings, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs are instructed to file the amended pleading [54-1] as a separate docket entry pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. For administrative purposes only, #54 Motion to Amend/Correct is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/3/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, MOTION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint ( Responses due by 4/16/2020) by Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc., Privateer Evolution, LLC. Attorney Brian W. Toth added to party Privateer Evolution, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #54 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Motion to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint and Join Privateer Evolution, LLC as Additional Defendant by Pedro Alejandro Gonzalez on behalf of Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Motion to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint and Join Privateer Evolution, LLC as Additional Defendant by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- proposed Amended Complaint)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/23/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #36 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, 51 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings or Join Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/10/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 50 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #36 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, to Amend Pleadings by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 49 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of Debra Saavedra filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 48 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of Brett Cummings filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of Left Coast Ventures, Inc. filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 46 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of Equitable Transitions, Inc. filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 45 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of Hugo Saavedra filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 44 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of EKO Holdings LLC filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, of Privateer Holdings Inc. filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #26 Order to Show Cause, Tilray, Inc. filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 41 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added William Downes as Mediator. (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 and #39 motions for extension of time. The motions are granted to the extent that the time is extended. The Court notes, however, concern with both motions. Both were filed on the date that the required filings were due. The Court cautions against such last-minute motions in the future. Further, #38 motion for extension of time was not filed in double-spaced formatting, contrary to 37 Notice of Court Practice. Future filings that do not conform to the Notice of Court Practice will be stricken. The filings are due on or before Thursday, February 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/21/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 39 First MOTION for Extension of Time to file initial disclosures re #36 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 38 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to select mediator and schedule mediation of seven business days re #36 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions.DONE AND ORDERED in Chambers, Fort Lauderdale, Florida, this 31st day of January 2020 (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2020., Discovery due by 10/22/2020., Expert Discovery due by 10/22/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 3/9/2020., Mediation Deadline 10/29/2020., In Limine Motions due by 11/6/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2020., Motions due by 11/6/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/5/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #32 Motion for Recusal; denying as moot #32 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/8/2020. (pb00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dates- Standard Case Management Track)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Recusal or, MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc., Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Websites, #2 Exhibit Emails, #3 Exhibit DBR Flyer, #4 Exhibit Declaration)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rever Holdings, LLC for Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc. (Blum, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.; the Verified Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction ([ECF No. 1-2] 3653) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of Compliance with LR 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys re #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 31, 2019 ***Attorney Thomas M. Geher for Brett Cummings, Thomas M. Geher for EKO Holdings LLC, Thomas M. Geher for Left Coast Ventures, Inc. added (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas M. Geher of the law firm of Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12264297 by Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Equitable Transitions Inc., Left Coast Ventures, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc., Debra Saavedra, Hugo Saavedra, Tilray, Inc.. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND ADJUDGED that on or before March 1, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why these Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) summons(es)) (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Striking #23 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 STRICKEN PER DE #24 . NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. (Gonzalez, Pedro) Modified on 12/27/2019 (lbc). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STRIKING #21 Notice of Unavailability filed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 (STRICKEN by DE#22 .) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. for dates of December 23, 2019 to January 7, 2020 (Gonzalez, Pedro) Modified to reflect "stricken" on 12/23/2019 (wc). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Opposition to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form 8-K)(Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting in Part: #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements on or before January 6, 2020. Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/6/2020 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc., Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc., Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III (Gonzalez, Pedro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Joseph Battista on behalf of Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc.. Attorney Paul Joseph Battista added to party Brett Cummings(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Joseph Battista added to party EKO Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Joseph Battista added to party Left Coast Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft). (Battista, Paul) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Barry Blum on behalf of Brett Cummings, EKO Holdings LLC, Left Coast Ventures, Inc.. Attorney William Barry Blum added to party Brett Cummings(pty:dft), Attorney William Barry Blum added to party EKO Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Barry Blum added to party Left Coast Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft). (Blum, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Lauren Rainwater. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) John Goldmark. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of Compliance with LR 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (cco) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 10, 2019 ***Attorney John Goldmark, Lauren Rainwater for Privateer Holdings, Inc., John Goldmark, Lauren Rainwater for Tilray, Inc. added (cco) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lauren Rainwater. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12211277 by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice - Lauren Rainwater)(Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Goldmark. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12211243 by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice - John Goldmark)(Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Privateer Holdings, Inc. (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Tilray, Inc. (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Of Removal To Us District Court (Federal Court)) (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Freddy Funes on behalf of Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Funes, Freddy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers to the Complaint within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12203540, filed by Tilray, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - Saavedra Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Privateer SOS, #5 Exhibit E - EKO SOS, #6 Exhibit F - Left Coast SOS, #7 Exhibit G - Trimax SOS, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toth, Brian) Text Modified on 12/6/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.[Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. et al v. Tilray, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Vazquez, III
Represented By: Pedro Alejandro Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Pedro Alejandro Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trimax Corporation
Represented By: Pedro Alejandro Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Left Coast Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Battista
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Thomas M. Geher
Represented By: Thomas Michael Geher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilray, Inc.
Represented By: Freddy Funes
Represented By: Brian W. Toth
Represented By: John A Goldmark
Represented By: Lauren B Rainwater
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Transitions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privateer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Freddy Funes
Represented By: Brian W. Toth
Represented By: John A Goldmark
Represented By: Lauren B Rainwater
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privateer Evolution LLC
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Cummings
Represented By: Paul Joseph Battista
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Thomas M. Geher
Represented By: Thomas Michael Geher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EKO Holdings LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Battista
Represented By: William Barry Blum
Represented By: Thomas M. Geher
Represented By: Thomas Michael Geher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privateer Evolution, LLC
Represented By: Brian W. Toth
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Represented By: John A Goldmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?