Ronald L. Pierce v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Pierce
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Foster Wheeler LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., Does 1 through 400, inclusive, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Fryer Knowles, Inc., Metalclad Insulation Corporation, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., CLA-VAL Co., Crane Co., CBS Corporation, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. and Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv05336
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Arpi Galfayan counsel for Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. Adding Arpi Galfayan as counsel of record for Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Syd Carpente, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair.. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-05336 PSG(Ex). (rn)
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Macy M Chan counsel for Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.. MACY M. CHAN is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.. (Chan, Macy)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 02:00 PM. (vv)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ana T Reeg counsel for Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.. Adding Ana T. Reeg as counsel of record for Alfa Laval Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reeg, Ana)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth N Tanibata-Branham on behalf of Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. (Attorney Elizabeth N Tanibata-Branham added to party Alfa Laval Inc.(pty:dft))(Tanibata-Branham, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE ALFA LAVAL, INC.S NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.. ALFA LAVAL, INC.S NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Reeg, Ana)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, with JURY DEMAND ALFA LAVAL INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc..(Attorney Ana T Reeg added to party Alfa Laval Inc.(pty:dft))(Reeg, Ana)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geoffrey M Davis counsel for Defendant Crane Co.. Adding Geoffrey M. Davis as counsel of record for Crane Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachment 1 Notice of Appearance, 2 Notice of Interested Parties, Civil Cover Sheet and Proof of Service should be e-filed separately and in the correct event category. Notice of Appearance is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. Notice of Interested Parties event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. Civil Cover Sheet is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Proof of service event is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service of Subsequent Document Filings. (car)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
June 15, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc. Filed in State Court on 5/26/2020 Submitted with Pg 71 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Dean A Olson added to party Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
June 15, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., CBS Corporation, CLA-VAL Co., Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., Does 1 through 400, inclusive, Foster Wheeler LLC, Fryer Knowles, Inc., J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ronald L. Pierce. Filed in State Court on 3/20/2020 Submitted with Exhibit 1 pg 15 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 15, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. Submitted with Pg 77 of the Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Kenneth B Prindle added to party SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
June 15, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Submitted with Pg. 93 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Steven J Barber added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Erika Rose Aspericueta added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(car)
June 15, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Submitted with Pg 103 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(car)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV112182 Receipt No: ACACDC-26818211 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, #4 PROOF OF SERVICE) (Attorney Macy M Chan added to party Alfa Laval Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Chan, Macy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald L. Pierce v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Macy M Chan
Represented By: Elizabeth N Tanibata-Branham
Represented By: Ana T Reeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven J Barber
Represented By: Erika Rose Aspericueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dean A Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Kenneth B Prindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer Knowles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Pierce
Represented By: Ari Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?