In Re Grandview Hills LLC
Appellee: Melissa Leskinen, Timeout, LP and Michael Leskinen
Appellant: Grandview Hills LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05376
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Notice Of Filing Requests For Transcripts Relating To Pending Appeals (with Proof of Service) filed by Appellant Grandview Hills LLC. (with Proof of Service) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Order Forms, #2 Exhibit ECF Filing Receipts)(Esbin, Louis)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Transcript and Transcripts forwarded (yl)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 (with Proof of Service) Disclosure of Interested Parties, Pursuant to L.R. 7.1-1 of Interested Parties filed by Appellant Grandview Hills LLC, identifying Grandview Hills, LLC; George I. Gabriel; Isaac S. Gabriel; Mounira S. Gabriel; Tymeout, LP; Michael Leskinan; Melissa Leskinan. (Attorney Louis Jay Esbin added to party Grandview Hills LLC(pty:db))(Esbin, Louis)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellant Grandview Hills LLC. (with Proof of Service) Related Case(s): 2:20cv05378, 2:20cv05377, 2:20cv05376 (Esbin, Louis)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) form #3 has the wrong Judge. Please see attachment for corrected CV-26 Form. (Attachments: #1 Corrected CV-26 Form) (car)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 6/23/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 6] NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) Modified on 6/23/2020 (car).
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 6/17/2020. (car)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: RE ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER 11 U.S.C. 362 entered on 4/28/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Sheri Bluebond, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 6/16/20. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:19-bk-21726-BB, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Grandview Hills LLC. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) Modified on 6/18/2020 (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Grandview Hills LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Melissa Leskinen
Represented By: Kristi M Wells
Represented By: Edward Thomas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timeout, LP
Represented By: Kristi M Wells
Represented By: Edward Thomas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Leskinen
Represented By: Kristi M Wells
Represented By: Edward Thomas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Grandview Hills LLC
Represented By: Louis Jay Esbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?