In Re Grandview Hills, LLC
Appellee: Tymeout, LP, Melissa Leskinen and Michael Leskinen
Appellant: Grandview Hills, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05378
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Transcript and Transcripts forwarded. (yl)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05376 VAP. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05378 VAP. Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellant Grandview Hills, LLC. (with Proof of Service) Related Case(s): 2:20cv05378, 2:20cv05377, 2:20cv05376 (Esbin, Louis)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 6/17/2020. (ghap)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order on Debtor's Objection to Claim No 6 By Claimant Tymeout LP, Etc., et al entered on 6/10/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Sheri Bludbond, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 6/16/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:19-bk-21726-BB, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Grandview Hills, LLC. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Grandview Hills, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tymeout, LP
Represented By: Kristi M Wells
Represented By: Edward Thomas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Melissa Leskinen
Represented By: Kristi M Wells
Represented By: Edward Thomas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Leskinen
Represented By: Kristi M Wells
Represented By: Edward Thomas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Grandview Hills, LLC
Represented By: Louis Jay Esbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?