Lilian Amaya v. Los Burritos, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lilian Amaya
Defendant: The Rawlings Group, Inc., Los Burritos, Inc, DOE, The Rawlings Group, The Rawlings Company, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Los Burritos, Inc. and Does 1 to 25
Case Number: 2:2020cv05389
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 24 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case number: 19STCV11607. (jp)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Remanding Civil Action to Superior Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The above-entitled case is ordered REMANDED to the Superior Court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
June 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action for Declaratory Relief for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be granted filed by defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen M. Barrens, #2 Declaration of Dennis L. Althouse, #3 Exhibit 1 to Althouse Decl - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 to Althouse Decl - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 to Althouse Decl - Stip and Order re First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 4 to Althouse Decl - POS by mail to The Rawlings Group, a CA entity, #7 Exhibit 5 to Althouse Decl - POS by mail to The Rawlings Group, Inc., a CA entity, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action for Declaratory Relief) (Althouse, Dennis)
June 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Counterclaim #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Crossclaim - under Category - Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Motion #16 , for the following reasons: Memorandum of Points and Authorities contains single-spaced text. LR 11-3.6. (jp)
June 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Claimant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. correcting Summons Request #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Summons, #2 Proof of Service)(Althouse, Dennis)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim #17 filed by cross-complainant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Althouse, Dennis)
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Los Burritos, Inc., filed by cross-complainant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kaiser Foundation Health Plan)(Althouse, Dennis)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 6/25/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - NOTICE of Motion and Motion of Defendant THE RAWLINGS COMPANY, LLC TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen M. Barrens, #2 Declaration of Dennis L. Althouse, #3 Exhibit to Althouse Decl - 1 First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit to Althouse Decl - 2 Complaint, #5 Exhibit to Althouse Decl - 3 Stip and Order re First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit to Althouse Decl - 4 POS by mail to The Rawlings Group, a CA entity, #7 Exhibit to Althouse Decl - 5 POS by mail to The Rawlings Group, Inc., a CA entity, #8 Proposed Order)(Althouse, Dennis) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jp).
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc..(Althouse, Dennis)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Althouse, Dennis)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/9/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Althouse, Dennis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Robert Troughton re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Althouse, Dennis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Dennis L. Althouse re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Althouse, Dennis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
June 17, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Los Burritos, Inc., The Rawlings Company, LLC, The Rawlings Group, The Rawlings Group, Inc. amending Complaint; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Lilian Amaya. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
June 17, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Los Burritos, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/22/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
June 17, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Lilian Amaya, upon Defendant Los Burritos, Inc. served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose H. Villareal, registered agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 17, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Los Burritos, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Lilian Amaya. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/4/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Re Removal Documents served on June 17, 2020. (Althouse, Dennis)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Related Case(s): 20STCV20412 (Althouse, Dennis)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Althouse, Dennis)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., (Althouse, Dennis)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Althouse, Dennis)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: ACACDC-26852064 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Summons on First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Proof of Substituted Service, #6 Exhibit Answer to Complaint - Los Burritos, #7 Exhibit Stipulation and Order, #8 Exhibit Order to File First Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Notice of Related Case 08-07-19, #10 Exhibit Notice of Court Order 09-04-19, #11 Exhibit Notice of Related Case 06-04-20, #12 Exhibit Notice of Firm Name Change - Plaintiff) (Attorney Dennis L Althouse added to party Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft))(Althouse, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilian Amaya v. Los Burritos, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rawlings Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Burritos, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rawlings Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rawlings Company, LLC
Represented By: Dennis L Althouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis L Althouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Burritos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilian Amaya
Represented By: Aren Manukyan
Represented By: Hagop N Chopurian
Represented By: Roy Penuela
Represented By: Tevin Sarin Chopurian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?