Hector M. Carreon v. Juan De La Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Hector Carreon and Hector M. Carreon
Defendant: Sonia Chavez, Salvador M Salinas, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, INC, Affinia Default Services, LLC., De La Cruz Juan, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, All Person Unknown, Salvador M. Salinas, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Affinia Default Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Juan De La Cruz and Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05534
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case number. 20STCV06186. (et)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Remanding Action by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that: The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Any pending motion is denied as moot. [Case Terminated. Made JS-6] (et)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #9 is taken off the 7/30/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 7/30/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice (Other) #16 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fabrizi, Larry)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Re: Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Hector M. Carreon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Fabrizi, Larry)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Larry Fabrizi re Notice (Other) #16 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Hector M. Carreon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Fabrizi, Larry)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 *CORRECTED BY CLERK* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Hector M. Carreon. Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Fabrizi, Larry) Modified on 7/22/2020 (vdr).
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mase, Andrew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mase, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 with proof of service filed by Plaintiff Hector M. Carreon. (Fabrizi, Larry)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Ryan, Timothy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ryan, Timothy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Ryan, Timothy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Hector M. Carreon, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Mase, Andrew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
June 22, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Affinia Default Services, LLC, All Person Unknown, Sonia Chavez, Juan De La Cruz, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Salvador M. Salinas, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Hector M. Carreon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1)(ghap)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Judicial Notice re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Mase, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, INC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Mase, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV06186 Receipt No: ACACDC-26908956 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, INC. (Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft))(Mase, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector M. Carreon v. Juan De La Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector M. Carreon
Represented By: Larry David Fabrizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador M Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, INC
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Cruz Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Person Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador M. Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?