Luc Richard Elie et al v. Los Angeles Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Luc Richard Elie
Defendant: CARRIE SCHWARTZ, Los Angeles Unified School District, Ricardo Rosales, KIMBERLY ABDUL MALIK, Ken Harris, SAMUEL MARK SCHWARZMER, Jose Fernandez and NISEAN MAE ELLIOTT
Not Classified By Court: Estate of Xavier Patterson
Case Number: 2:2020cv05538
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Los Angeles Unified School District answer now due 10/2/2020, filed by Defendant Los Angeles Unified School District.(Attorney John Robert Meehan added to party Los Angeles Unified School District(pty:dft))(Meehan, John)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luc Richard Elie, identifying Los Angeles Unified School District; Samuel Mark Schwarzmer, Ricardo Rosales, Jose Fernandez, Carrie Schwartz, Ken Harris, Kimberly Abdul Malik and Nisean Mae Elliott. (Goldstein, Jamie)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Samuel Mark Schwarzmer. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Carrie Schwartz. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ricardo Rosales. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Kimberly Abdul Malik. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Los Angeles Unified School District. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ken Harris. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Jose Fernandez. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Nisean Mae Elliott. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Luc Richard Elie, Estate of Xavier Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Samuel M. Schwarzmer, #2 Summons to Rocardo Rosales, #3 Summons to Jose Fernandez, #4 Summons to Carrie Schwartz, #5 Summons to Ken Harris, #6 Summons to Kimberly Abdul Malik, #7 Summons to Nisean Mae Elliott)(Sanguinetti, Elise)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luc Richard Elie, Estate of Estate of Xavier Patterson. (Sanguinetti, Elise)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26909626 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Estate of Xavier Patterson, Luc Richard Elie. (Attorney Elise R Sanguinetti added to party Luc Richard Elie(pty:pla), Attorney Elise R Sanguinetti added to party Estate of Xavier Patterson(pty:est))(Sanguinetti, Elise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luc Richard Elie et al v. Los Angeles Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIE SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Unified School District
Represented By: Alison A Korgan
Represented By: Rodolfo F Ruiz
Represented By: John Robert Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY ABDUL MALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL MARK SCHWARZMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISEAN MAE ELLIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Estate of Xavier Patterson
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luc Richard Elie
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Represented By: Jamie Greer Goldstein
Represented By: Eugene Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?