Herbert Dew v. Spirit Airlines, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Dew
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Spirit Airlines, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Roes
Case Number: 2:2020cv05607
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The initial status conference previously scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Jury trial is set for 02/02/2021 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 01/25/2021 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc... (Lazenby, Richard)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/24/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Spirit Airlines, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on June 25, 2020. (Lazenby, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
June 24, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (as cross-complaint in state court) against third-party defendant Roes (as cross-defendant in state court), Jury Demanded, filed by third-party plaintiff Spirit Airlines, Inc. (filed in state court 5/8/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 24, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc. (filed in state court 5/8/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
June 24, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Spirit Airlines, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Herbert Dew. (filed in state court 11/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 3) (esa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Spirit Airlines, Inc., identifying Spirit Airlines, Inc., and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Lazenby, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Lazenby, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV40927 Receipt No: ACACDC-26940854 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Richard A Lazenby added to party Spirit Airlines, Inc.(pty:3pp))(Lazenby, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert Dew v. Spirit Airlines, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A Lazenby
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Dew
Represented By: Muammar Q Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?