Lickerish Limited v. Maven Coalition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lickerish Limited
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Maven Coalition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05621
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander R. Malbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Maven Coalition, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27679428) filed by defendant Maven Coalition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order granting pro hac vice application) (Olsen, John)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maven Coalition, Inc., identifying Maven, Inc.. (Olsen, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Maven Coalition, Inc..(Olsen, John)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maven Coalition, Inc. answer now due 8/17/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited.(Doniger, Stephen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited. correcting Notice of Lodging #2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Complaint)(Doniger, Stephen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited, upon Defendant Maven Coalition, Inc. served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service c/o Kaitlyn Mannix\Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maven Coalition, Inc. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited. (Doniger, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lickerish Limited. (Doniger, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited, identifying Maven Coalition, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited. (Doniger, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Exhibit A and Exhibit B re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Doniger, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26942786 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lickerish Limited. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Lickerish Limited(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lickerish Limited v. Maven Coalition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maven Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: John F Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lickerish Limited
Represented By: Elina Eteri Kharit
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?