Paul D. Beauregard et al v. Scott Arceneaux Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J, Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul, Jordan Houston and Paul D. Beauregard
Defendant: Aristos Petrou p/k/a Ruby da Cherry, UMG Recordings, Inc., G59 Records, L.L.C., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Scott Arceneaux Jr. p/k/a Scrim, Scott Arceneaux, Jr., Aristos Petrou and UMG Recordings, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually and doing business as Caroline Distribution and Capitol Music Group
Case Number: 2:2020cv05655
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard, Jordan Houston. upon G59 Records, L.L.C. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Timothy C. Matson. (Snow, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard, Jordan Houston. upon Aristos Petrou waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Timothy C. Matson. (Snow, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard, Jordan Houston. upon Scott Arceneaux, Jr waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Timothy C. Matson. (Snow, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UMG Recordings, Inc. answer now due 8/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard; Jordan Houston.(Snow, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul D. Beauregard, Jordan Houston, upon Defendant UMG Recordings, Inc. served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Snow, John)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Scott Arceneaux, Jr, G59 Records, L.L.C., Aristos Petrou, UMG Recordings, Inc. (car)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul, Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J. (Snow, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Snow, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul, Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J. (Snow, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul, Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J. (Snow, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26954270 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul, Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J. (Attorney John G Snow added to party Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul(pty:pla), Attorney John G Snow added to party Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J(pty:pla))(Snow, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul D. Beauregard et al v. Scott Arceneaux Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristos Petrou p/k/a Ruby da Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G59 Records, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Arceneaux Jr. p/k/a Scrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Arceneaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristos Petrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually and doing business as Caroline Distribution and Capitol Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Houston p/k/a Juicy J
Represented By: John G Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Beauregard p/k/a DJ Paul
Represented By: John G Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Houston
Represented By: John G Snow
Represented By: Henry D Gradstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Beauregard
Represented By: John G Snow
Represented By: Henry D Gradstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?