Clipsy, LLC v. Raymond Hahn et al
Plaintiff: Clipsy, LLC
Defendant: Raymond Hahn, Raymond's Boutique and Raymond Hahn an individual doing business as Raymond's Boutique
Case Number: 2:2020cv05689
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Raymond Hahn d/b/a Raymond's Boutique #16 served on 09/21/2020. (Lloyd, Jennifer)
September 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Raymond Hahn d/b/a Raymond's Boutique filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #2 Declaration of Jonathan W. Fountain in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #4 Exhibit Attachment A to Proposed Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction) (Lloyd, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause in writing on or before September 18, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond in writing, may result in the dismissal of the entire action. (see document for further details) (bm)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Raymond Hahn, an individual, doing business as Raymond's Boutique (bm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Default against Raymond Hahn Raymond Hahn filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Lloyd, Jennifer)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Clipsy, LLC. (Lloyd, Jennifer)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC, upon Defendant Raymond Hahn served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Raymond Hahn individually dba Raymond's Boutique in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lloyd, Jennifer)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Raymond Hahn. (lh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC. EXHIBITS A - G TO COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Design Patents, #2 Exhibit B - Utility Patents, #3 Exhibit C - WHOIS search results for RAYMOND'S BOUTIQUE, #4 Exhibit D - Redirect from website to Amazon, #5 Exhibit E - Loginov Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Fountain Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Current Amazon Ad)(Lloyd, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC, identifying Favardin Kamangar. (Lloyd, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC. (Lloyd, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC. (Lloyd, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26962679 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Clipsy, LLC. (Attorney Jennifer Renee Lloyd added to party Clipsy, LLC(pty:pla))(Lloyd, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clipsy, LLC v. Raymond Hahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond's Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Hahn an individual doing business as Raymond's Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clipsy, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?