Aurdra Lundin v. SF Markets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Audra Lundin
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC and Does 1 to 10
Petitioner: SF Markets LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05714
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Electronic Filing re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 e-mailed to Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 Recipient address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Audra Lundin. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez added to party Audra Lundin(pty:pla)) (Sepulveda Sanchez, Gabriel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) OSC RE UNTIMELY REMOVAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Motions to remand based on procedural objections to a removal must be made within thirty days after the filing of the notice of removal. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to move to remand based on untimeliness, she must do so no later than July 27, 2020, or this potential defect in removal is waived. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
June 26, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2019) SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap)
June 26, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, SF Markets, LLC., filed by plaintiff Audra Lundin. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) Modified on 6/29/2020 (ghap).
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SF Markets LLC, identifying Chubb (Insurance); Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC (managing member); Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc. (managing member of Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC). (Aho, Allen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant SF Markets LLC. (Aho, Allen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV22680 Receipt No: ACACDC-26973434 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant SF Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Allen Steele Aho added to party SF Markets LLC(pty:mov))(Aho, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aurdra Lundin v. SF Markets, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SF Markets LLC
Represented By: Allen Steele Aho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Lundin
Represented By: Marc E Grossman
Represented By: Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC
Represented By: Allen Steele Aho
Represented By: Richard Gary Somes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?