United States of America v. One Portrait Entitled "Round Jackie" by Andy Warhol
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Portrait Entitled "Round Jackie" by Andy Warhol
Case Number: 2:2020cv05917
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
2 Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
3 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 7/9/2020 and 7/10/2020 upon Defendant One Portrait Entitled "Round Jackie" by Andy Warhol last date of publication 8/7/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Publication was made in the the official government website (www.forfeiture.gov). (Levy, Barbara)
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM as to One Portrait Entitled "Round Jackie" by Andy Warhol issued. (et)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Issuing Warrant for Arrest In Rem #20 . (See order for specifics). (et)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levy, Barbara)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Warrant for Seizure Request #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Warrant caption does not match complaint caption verbatim. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Levy, Barbara)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/24/20. (rfi)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 **STRICKEN** EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant) (Sohn, Joshua) Modified on 8/17/2020 (rfi).
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/14/2020 - This must be done in the form of an Ex Parte/Application. (rfi)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Warrant #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Issuance - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 **STRICKEN**Warrant filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Sohn, Joshua) Modified on 8/7/2020 (rfi).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua L Sohn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Joshua L Sohn added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Sohn, Joshua)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01899 DSF(VBKx). Case transferred from Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05917 DSF(PLAx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): 2:16-CV-5366-DSF (PLAx) (Levy, Barbara)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF CONFLICT RE MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Levy, Barbara)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on July 1, 2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters (Levy, Barbara)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Levy, Barbara)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Attorney Barbara Y Levy added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Levy, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Portrait Entitled "Round Jackie" by Andy Warhol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Portrait Entitled "Round Jackie" by Andy Warhol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara Y Levy
Represented By: Joshua L Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?