Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.91.109.161
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.91.109.161
Case Number: 2:2020cv05920
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Granting Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Take Early Discovery #10 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27032974 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.91.109.161
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.91.109.161
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?