Steven Romo et al v. Durham D&M LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Romo and Shannon Dickinson
Defendant: Durham D&M LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06057
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethany A Pelliconi counsel for Defendant Durham D&M LLC. Filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC. (Attorney Bethany A Pelliconi added to party Durham D&M LLC(pty:dft))(Pelliconi, Bethany)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL - I. ORDER RE DEADLINES; II. ORDER RE TRIAL PREPARATION; III. ORDER GOVERNING CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. See order for deadlines and other information. (lom)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 12, 2021. A Status Report Regarding Settlement shall be filed no later than: August 23, 2021. Counsel are directed to contact the private mediator of their choice to arrange a date and time for the mediation. (lom)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 11:00am. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Schimmel, Miriam)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff: 7 to 10; Defendant: 30, filed by Plaintiffs Shannon Dickinson, Steven Romo.. (Schimmel, Miriam)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document is blank. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff: 7 to 10; Defendant: 30, filed by Plaintiffs Shannon Dickinson, Steven Romo.. (Schimmel, Miriam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, (Schimmel, Miriam)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC. (Pelliconi, Bethany)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Miriam L Schimmel on behalf of Plaintiffs Shannon Dickinson, Steven Romo (Attorney Miriam L Schimmel added to party Shannon Dickinson(pty:pla), Attorney Miriam L Schimmel added to party Steven Romo(pty:pla))(Schimmel, Miriam)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 08/10/20 at 11:00 AM (pg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on July 8, 2020. (Afar, Michael)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
July 7, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Durham D&M LLC, filed by plaintiffs Steven Romo, Shannon Dickinson. (filed in state court 1/21/20, submitted as document 1, p. 14) (esa)
July 7, 2020 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Durham D&M LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, p. 46)(esa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC (Afar, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC, (Afar, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Richard Cozza in Support of Defendant's re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC. (Afar, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC. (Afar, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pomona Courthouse South, case number 20PSCV00056 Receipt No: ACACDC-27110604 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Durham D&M LLC. (Attorney Michael Afar added to party Durham D&M LLC(pty:dft))(Afar, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Romo et al v. Durham D&M LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham D&M LLC
Represented By: Michael Afar
Represented By: Jonathan D Meer
Represented By: Bethany A Pelliconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Romo
Represented By: Miriam L Schimmel
Represented By: Kenneth S Gaines
Represented By: Daniel F Gaines
Represented By: Evan Simon Gaines
Represented By: Alex P Katofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Dickinson
Represented By: Miriam L Schimmel
Represented By: Kenneth S Gaines
Represented By: Daniel F Gaines
Represented By: Evan Simon Gaines
Represented By: Alex P Katofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?