Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Mary A. Watkins et al
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary A. Watkins, Does 1 through 5, inclusive, Sharon Favors, Doe 1 and Does 2 through 5, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06089
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. upon Mary A. Watkins waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/4/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Mary Watkins. (Johna, Ophir)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $110,789.59 into the registry of the Court from Primerica Life Insurance Company on 08/03/2020. Re: Order on Motion to Deposit Funds,, #15 . Receipt number LA209524. (pri)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE Amended Notice of Deposit of Interpleader Funds [Fed. R. Civ. P. 67; L. R. 67-1] filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. correcting REQUEST to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry #16 (Johna, Ophir)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 as to defendants Doe 1, Mary A. Watkins. (mrgo)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY BY PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERPLEADER PRIMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY by Judge George H. Wu re: #13 APPLICATION to Deposit Funds. The Court hereby orders and directs the Clerk of the United States District Court to accept Primerica's deposit of the funds at issue in the action, to wit, $110,789.59, representing the policy benefit payable under the subject insurance policy ($110,000.00) and interest on the same ($789.59), and to deposit said funds in an interest-bearing account pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67. (mrgo)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johna, Ophir)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOE 1, in his or her capacity as representative of the Estate of Marvin C. Watkins, Does, Mary A. Watkins amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company(Johna, Ophir)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Sharon Favors and Mary A. Watkins. (yl)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-06089 GW(RAOx). (rn)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company, identifying Mary A. Watkins (Defendant in Interpleader); Sharon Favors (Defendant in Interpleader). (Johna, Ophir)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company identifying Primerica, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Johna, Ophir)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27124091 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Ophir Johna added to party Primerica Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Johna, Ophir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Mary A. Watkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Favors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 5, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ophir Johna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?