Jeffrey Garcia v. J2 Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Garcia
Defendant: Vivek R. Shah, R. Scott Turicchi, Nehemia Zucker, J2 Global, Inc. and Vivek Shah
Case Number: 2:2020cv06096
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #14 . Before the underlying case can proceed, a lead plaintiff and lead counsel must be appointed by the Court. See 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B). In this case, the deadline for filing a motion to be appointed lead plaintiff is September 8, 2020. Within 30 days of entry of an Order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel, lead plaintiff shall file a consolidated or an amended complaint, or notify defendants in writing that lead plaintiff intends to rely on the current complaint. (See document for further details) (mrgo)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants J2 Global, Inc., Vivek Shah, R. Scott Turicchi, Nehemia Zucker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of the Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Sacks, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Nehemia Zucker, Vivek Shah, J2 Global, Inc., R. Scott Turicchi.(Sacks, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Sacks, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS DENIED by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #10 . (mrgo)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant J2 Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Attorney Robert A Sacks added to party J2 Global, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sacks, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Garcia, upon Defendant J2 Global, Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares (Managing Agent of Defendant's Registered Agent) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Rosen, Laurence)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (et)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants J2 Global, Inc., Vivek Shah, R. Scott Turicchi, Nehemia Zucker. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Garcia, (Rosen, Laurence)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Garcia. (Rosen, Laurence)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Garcia. (Rosen, Laurence)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27126463 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Garcia. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Jeffrey Garcia(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Garcia v. J2 Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek R. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Scott Turicchi
Represented By: Robert M W Smith
Represented By: Robert A Sacks
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nehemia Zucker
Represented By: Robert M W Smith
Represented By: Robert A Sacks
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J2 Global, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M W Smith
Represented By: Robert A Sacks
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek Shah
Represented By: Robert M W Smith
Represented By: Robert A Sacks
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Garcia
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?