Brenda Core v. Northridge Square LP et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Core
Defendant: Northridge Square LP and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv06106
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Northridge Square LP, a California Limited Partnership (shb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant All Defendants filed by plaintiff Brenda Core. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Shahriari in support of request for default, #2 Exhibit A (Executed Proof of Service of Case Initiating Documents)) (Shahriari, Peter)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff /s to show cause in writing no later than August 17, 2020, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendant/s Answer/Response to the Complaint/Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default on defendant/s OR appropriate request for dismissal of this action. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which aresponse by plaintiff/s is due. Plaintiff is to serve notice of this Order on all named parties in this action who have been served but have not yet appeared.See order for further details. (shb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brenda Core, upon Defendant Northridge Square LP served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Herman Polarz - Agent in charge authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Peter)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Northridge Square LP. (car)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brenda Core, (Shahriari, Peter)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core. (Shahriari, Peter)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brenda Core. (Shahriari, Peter)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27134282 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brenda Core. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Brenda Core(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenda Core v. Northridge Square LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northridge Square LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Core
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?