In Re Debtor: Jadelle Jewelry and Diamonds, LLC et al
Appellee: First International Diamond, Inc., Victor Franco Noval and Jadelle Jewelry and Diamonds, LLC
Appellant: Rachel Rechnitz
Case Number: 2:2020cv06232
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: David O Carter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONSOLIDATING AND DISMISSING CASES. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Consolidate Appeals. As the Court finds that none of the appellants have standing to bring these appeals, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motions to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal. All other open motions in this action are accordingly DENIED AS MOOT. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.), Cases associated with Lead Case LACV20-6183 DOC. (twdb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 9/4/2020. (lom)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 , Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #2 , Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court #6 , Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) #9 . The undersigned deputy clerk of the United States Bankruptcy Court certifies that the record on appeal is complete and is available electronically on the case docket. The transcript status is as follows: All transcripts requested by either the Appellant, Appellee, or both, have been filed with this court. (lom)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF ISSUES to be Presented on Appeal and DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Appellant Rachel Rechnitz. (gk)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06183 DOC. Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06232 DOC. Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derrick M Talerico on behalf of Appellant Rachel Rechnitz (Attorney Derrick M Talerico added to party Rachel Rechnitz(pty:a))(Talerico, Derrick)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Brett Zolkin on behalf of Appellant Rachel Rechnitz (Attorney David Brett Zolkin added to party Rachel Rechnitz(pty:a))(Zolkin, David)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The docket reflects that a bankruptcy appeal has been filed in the above-entitled action, but that appellant has not filed the required F.R.B.P. Rule 8009 records. Appellant is Ordered to Show Cause no later than 8/3/2020, why the appeal should not be dismissed for these deficiencies. The Court may consider Appellant's filing of the missing required documents and fees, along with a declaration of good cause for the delay, sufficient response to the order to show cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY COURT'S APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, Notice of Transcripts not filed, as required by FRBP 8003 and 8009, forwarded to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (gk)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES IN APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL DEFICIENCY TO APPELLANT. (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT. (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Rachel Rechnitz Re: Order for Relief and Order to File Schedules, Statements and Lists enter on June 16, 2020 entered on June 16, 2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Barry Russell, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on June 30, 2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:20-bk-13530, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: CC-20-1160. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket) (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Rachel Rechnitz Re: Order for Relief and order to File Schedules, Statements and Lists entered on June 16, 2020 entered on June 16, 2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Barry Russell, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 6/30/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:20- bk-13530, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: C-20-1160. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Debtor: Jadelle Jewelry and Diamonds, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: First International Diamond, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A Lev
Represented By: Baruch C Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Victor Franco Noval
Represented By: Daniel A Lev
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jadelle Jewelry and Diamonds, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lewis Simon
Represented By: Robert S Marticello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rachel Rechnitz
Represented By: Derrick M Talerico
Represented By: David Brett Zolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?