United States of America v. $41,400.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $41,400.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2020cv06242
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katharine Schonbachler counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. John J. Kucera is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katharine Schonbachler on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Katharine Schonbachler added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Schonbachler, Katharine)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of $41,400.00 in U.S. Currency issued #1 . (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kucera, John)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum re: Magistrate Judges (Kucera, John)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum re: District Court Judges filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kucera, John)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kucera, John)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney John Kucera added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Kucera, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $41,400.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $41,400.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Kucera
Represented By: Katharine Schonbachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?