Kevin Zhang Inc. et al v. Joe Rozsa
Plaintiff: Kevin Zhang and Kevin Zhang Inc.
Defendant: Joe Rozsa, Does 1-10, Jay Rich Veyron and Joseph Richard Rozsa
Case Number: 2:2020cv06247
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Joe Rozsa, (Bardavid, Moises)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 by Clerk of Court. Counsel are directed to file their Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (mrgo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Joe Rozsa and Ofelya Mamyan Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendant Joe Rozsa. (Bardavid, Moises)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendant Joe Rozsa. (Bardavid, Moises)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Joe Rozsa. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attorney Moises Saul Bardavid added to party Joe Rozsa(pty:dft)) (Bardavid, Moises)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kevin Zhang Inc., upon Defendant Joe Rozsa served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOE ROZSA aka JOSEPH RICHARD ROZSA aka JAY RICH VEYRON in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sorrell, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NEW CASE ORDER filed by plaintiffs Kevin Zhang Inc., Kevin Zhang. (Sorrell, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06247 SVW(AFMx). (rn)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Joe Rozsa. (esa)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiffs Kevin Zhang Inc., Kevin Zhang. (Sorrell, Paul)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Sorrell, Paul)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Zhang Inc., Kevin Zhang. (Sorrell, Paul)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27200335 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Kevin Zhang Inc., Kevin Zhang. (Attorney Paul N Sorrell added to party Kevin Zhang Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul N Sorrell added to party Kevin Zhang(pty:pla))(Sorrell, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kevin Zhang Inc. et al v. Joe Rozsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Rozsa
Represented By: Moises Saul Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Rich Veyron
Represented By: Moises Saul Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Richard Rozsa
Represented By: Moises Saul Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zhang
Represented By: Paul N Sorrell
Represented By: Martin F. Hirshland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zhang Inc.
Represented By: Paul N Sorrell
Represented By: Martin F. Hirshland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?