Salvador Aguilera v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Salvador Aguilera
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv06266
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-6266 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lara A Bradt added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bradt, Lara)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera. (Leland, Judith)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leland, Judith)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (jdo)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (jdo)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Item 1 is the wrong complaint for this case. The attorney has filed the correct complaint see item 3 on the docket. (et)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera. (Leland, Judith)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera, identifying Salvador Aguilera. (Leland, Judith)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera. (Leland, Judith)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera.(Leland, Judith)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera. (Leland, Judith)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 *CORRECT COMPLAINT SEE ITEM #3 -COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguilera. (Attorney Judith S Leland added to party Salvador Aguilera(pty:pla))(Leland, Judith) Modified on 7/15/2020 (et).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Aguilera v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Aguilera
Represented By: Judith S Leland
Represented By: Enrique M Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lara A Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?