Academy of Television Arts and Sciences v. Julien's Auctions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Academy of Television Arts and Sciences
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and Juliens Auctions LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06272
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the motion to extend time to file answer #27 is hereby denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTFOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; CONVERSION; REPLEVIN; AND DECLARATORY RELIEF #26 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Copyright Infringement; Conversion; Replevin; and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is September 24, 2020. (shb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; CONVERSION; REPLEVIN; AND DECLARATORY RELIEF #26 , #27 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Copyright Infringement; Conversion; Replevin; and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is September 24, 2020. (shb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/24/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Mosely, Laith)
August 27, 2020 Filing 26 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Juliens Auctions LLC answer now due 9/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mosely, Laith)
August 6, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Juliens Auctions LLC answer now due 8/27/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC.(Mosely, Laith)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation for Order, #20 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Parties Stipulation (Docket No. 20) is approved. 2. The Temporary Restraining Order granted by the Court on July 16, 2016 (Docket No. 18) relating to the sale, auction, or transfer of the 1971, 1972, 1973, and 1975 Valerie Harper Emmy Statuettes identified in the Television Academys request for Temporary Restraining Order (the Harper Statuettes) is converted to a Preliminary Injunction. 3. Juliens and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all those working in concert with Juliens are enjoined from reproducing, distributing, displaying, promoting, offering for sale, selling, auctioning, transferring, or advertising the Harper Statuettes during the pendency of this action. 4. Any bond requirement (including the requirement imposed by the Court as part of its Order granting the Television Academys request for Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 18)) is waived. 5. The briefing schedule set forth in the Courts Order granting the Television Academys request for Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 18) and the July 30, 2020 order to show cause hearing relating to the Television Academys request for preliminary injunction are vacated. The Order to Show cause hearing set for July 30, 2020 is vacated and off calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 UNDERTAKING BOND re TRO in the amount of $15,000.00 posted by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences tr BOND No. 3478190. SureTec Insurance Company. (shb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, upon Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bakewell, Eric)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences. Notice of Posting of Bond By Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences (Bakewell, Eric)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Order (1) Entry of Preliminary Injunction; and (2) Elimination of Bond Requirement filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bakewell, Eric)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Notices - Select - Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing from the document. The case number is: 2:20-cv-06272 CBM (AGRx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE, #7 ] by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order. All. for the Wild Rockies, 632 F.3d at 1135. Accordingly, Defendant and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all those working in concert with Defendant, are temporarily enjoined and restrained from offering for sale and/or selling the Harper Statuettes. Plaintiff shall post a bond no later than July 20 2020, in the amount of $15,000. Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than July 21, 2020, why a preliminary injunction should not be issued enjoining and restraining Defendant and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all those working in concert with Defendant, from offering for sale and/or selling the Harper Statuettes. Plaintiff shall file a response re the preliminary injunction no later than July 24, 2020. A hearing on the order to show cause re: preliminary injunction is set for July 30, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #7 filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences. (Bakewell, Eric)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, upon Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cody Fredrick, Director, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bakewell, Eric)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #7 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Darren Julien In Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Darren Julien in Support of Opposition, #3 Declaration Declaration of Laith D. Mosely In Support of Opposition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Laith D. Mosely In Support of Opposition, #5 Declaration Declaration of Margaret O'Brien In Support of Opposition)(Mosely, Laith)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 Julien's Auctions LLC's Objection to the Declaration of Maury McIntyre opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #7 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Mosely, Laith)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 Julien's Auctions, LLC's Objection to the Declaration of John Leverence opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #7 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Mosely, Laith)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC, identifying Estate of Valerie Harper. (Attorney Laith D Mosely added to party Juliens Auctions LLC(pty:dft))(Mosely, Laith)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew J Busch counsel for Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences. Adding Matthew J. Busch as counsel of record for Academy of Television Arts & Sciences for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences. (Busch, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Bakewell ISO Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of John Leverence ISO Ex Parte, #3 Declaration of Maury McIntyre ISO Ex Parte, #4 Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Bakewell, Eric)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Bakewell, Eric)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Request to Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Bakewell, Eric)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27208800 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Attorney Eric J Bakewell added to party Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation(pty:pla))(Bakewell, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Academy of Television Arts and Sciences v. Julien's Auctions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliens Auctions LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Michael Carle
Represented By: Robert M Shore
Represented By: Laith D Mosely
Represented By: Miles J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy of Television Arts and Sciences
Represented By: Eric J Bakewell
Represented By: Matthew J Busch
Represented By: Melissa Caren Rose McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?