Grace Cho v. Fatemeh Karimghafab et al
Plaintiff: GRACE CHO
Defendant: MARK MILLMAN, FATEMEH KARIMGHAFAB doing business as BUTTERFLY BEAUTY SALON and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2020cv06285
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint #10 . Having reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #11 , the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. The Court therefore dismisses the state law claims without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Grace Choto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by July 31, 2020. See minute order for details. (lom)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fatemeh Karimghafab, Mark Millman. (et)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 GRACE CHO. (Kim, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GRACE CHO. (Kim, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27220102 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party GRACE CHO(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace Cho v. Fatemeh Karimghafab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK MILLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FATEMEH KARIMGHAFAB doing business as BUTTERFLY BEAUTY SALON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE CHO
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?