In Re: Bernd Schaefers
Appellee: Blizzard Energy, Inc.
Appellant: Bernd Schaefers
Case Number: 2:2020cv06295
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: REQUEST for Relief AND Reconsideration #12 , for the following reasons: (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; (2) The relief Appellant requests must be sought by way of a properly noticed motion. (jp)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST for Relief and for Reconsideration filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (jp)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Response to Order to Show Cause and Designation of Record on Appeal submitted by Appellant Bernd Schaefers received on 8/18/2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) No copy provided for judge; (2) No proof of service attached to document(s); (3) Case closed on 8/18/2020 for lack of prosecution. (jp)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing Bankrupty Appeal by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby dismisses Appellant's Bankruptcy Appeal for lack of prosecution.. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). [Case Terminated. Made JS-6.] (et)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF RECORD filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (et)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Appellant to show cause in writing on or before 8/14/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO USDC. (et)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding It appears that Appellant has failed to: Pay the filing fee (28 U.S.C. 1930(b) and (c). Fees must be submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Central District of California, within 14 days from the notice issued by the Bankruptcy Clerk. forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (car)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Appeal filing fee was not paid forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (car)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 7/15/2020. (car)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER 11 U.S.C. 362 entered on 7/2/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Martin R Barash, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 7/15/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 9:19-bk-11163-MB, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Bernd Schaefers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Blizzard Energy, Inc.
Represented By: William C Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bernd Schaefers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?