Lesly Garcia v. LQ Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lesly Garcia
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive and LQ Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06306
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on July 16, 2020. (Aguado, Carmen)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachel J. Vinson counsel for Plaintiff Lesly Garcia. Adding Rachel J. Vinson as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Lesly Garcia for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lesly Garcia. (Attorney Rachel J. Vinson added to party Lesly Garcia(pty:pla))(Vinson, Rachel)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
July 15, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 15, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, LQ Management, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Lesly Garcia. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 15, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, LQ Management, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Lesly Garcia. Filed in State Court on 11/21/2019 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC. (Aguado, Carmen)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC, (Aguado, Carmen)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC. (Aguado, Carmen)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV41777 Receipt No: ACACDC-27223968 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Decker, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher Decker, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher Decker, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher Decker, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher Decker, #6 Declaration of Richard Sekunda, #7 Declaration of Christine Boyle, #8 Declaration of Monica Melancon, #9 Declaration of Ariel Kumpinsky) (Attorney Carmen M Aguado added to party LQ Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Aguado, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesly Garcia v. LQ Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management, LLC
Represented By: Carmen M Aguado
Represented By: Christopher William Decker
Represented By: David M Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesly Garcia
Represented By: Justin F Marquez
Represented By: Rachel J. Vinson
Represented By: Nicol Hajjar
Represented By: Bobby Saadian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?