United States of America v. Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California
Claimant: 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC, Khaled J. Al Sabah, County of Los Angeles, Franco Noval, Rexford Trust, Blue Orchid Financial LLC, Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC, Secured Capital Partners LLC and Victor Franco Noval
Case Number: 2:2020cv06314
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981 Civil Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 101 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to Amend Pleadings filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Merryman, Bryan)
February 24, 2023 Filing 100 AMENDED ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #55 filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Merryman, Bryan)
February 23, 2023 Filing 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Khaled J. Al-Sabah's motion for leave to file an amended answer #93 . Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
February 22, 2023 Filing 98 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court finds the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amended Answer #93 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing date of 3/6/2023, is hereby vacated, and the matter is hereby taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 17, 2023 Filing 97 Notice Regarding No Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer [ECF NO. 93] filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Merryman, Bryan)
February 7, 2023 Filing 96 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Claims of Claimant Khaled Al-Sabah #94 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #95 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Daniel)
February 7, 2023 Filing 95 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Claims of Claimant Khaled Al-Sabah #94 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
February 6, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Claims of Claimant Khaled Al-Sabah filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 4/3/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of AUSA Dan Boyle and Exhibits 7-9, #2 Declaration of IRS-CI Special Agent Geffrey Clark and Exhibits 1-6) (Boyle, Daniel)
February 6, 2023 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amended Answer filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Merryman, #2 Exhibit 1 to Merryman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Merryman Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Merryman, Bryan)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE STIPULATION BETWEEN THE GOVERNMENT AND CLAIMANT KHALED J. AL SABAH REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING FOR GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIMANT'S CLAIMS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation #91 , the government is to file its motion to strike the claims of claimant KHALED AL SABAH by 2/6/2023; Opposition papers are due by 3/6/2023; Replies, if any, are due by 3/20/2023; And the the Court will hear the motion on 4/3/2023 at 10:00 AM. (gk)
January 30, 2023 Filing 91 STIPULATION for Hearing re Government's Motion to Strike Claims of Khaled J. Al Sabah filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Government's Motion to Strike Claims)(Su, Alexander)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 31, 2023. Status Conference set for 8/14/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (kmh) (kmh).
December 5, 2022 Filing 90 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties 3/3/2023. Settlement Completion Cutoff 7/31/2023. Status Conference Re Settlement set for 8/14/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Factual Discovery cut-off 8/31/2023. Last Day to File Motions 9/8/2023. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/13/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Motions in limine shall be noticed for the same date and time of the Pretrial Conference, and filed 28 days prior thereto. Counsel are to confer regarding the Magistrate Judges identified in Court for settlement purposes. Counsel shall contact those Magistrate Judges' Courtroom Deputy Clerk regarding availability, forthwith. Case is referred to a magistrate judge for settlement purposes. ADR-12 to issue. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
December 5, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexander Su on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Alexander Su added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Su, Alexander)
November 28, 2022 Filing 87 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyle, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 86 MINUTES OF Zoom Further Status Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel as to the status of the consolidated cases, as stated on the record. The Court informs Mr. Gonzalez that he can not appear on behalf of the Family Trust and that counsel must be retained to represent the Family Trust. Mr. Gonzalez shall have 30 days, up to and including 11/2/2022, within which to retain counsel to represent the Family Trust. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference on 12/5/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder, to be held by Zoom. The parties' Joint Report shall be filed on or before 11/28/2022. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
September 30, 2022 Filing 85 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
September 28, 2022 Filing 84 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 83 . The 10/3/2022 Further Status Conference at 11:00 AM will be held by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's Website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 23, 2022 Filing 83 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re: Further Status Conference #77 , previously scheduled for 9/26/2022 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled. Further Status Conference is continued to 10/3/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #81 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 15, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Patrick William Nutter on behalf of Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah (Attorney Patrick William Nutter added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Nutter, Patrick)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Stipulation to Continue #79 . The settlement conference presently set for September 16, 2022 is continued pending the close of discovery in this consolidated action; and The parties may seek leave to reschedule the settlement conference prior to the close of discovery by application to this Court. (et)
September 7, 2022 Filing 79 STIPULATION to Continue Settlement Conference from September 16, 2022 to Pending the close of discovery in this consolidated action and the parties may seek leave to reschedule the settlement conference prior to the close of discovery Re: Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #75 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Daniel)
August 1, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #71 . The following error(s) was/were found: A Claim was not filed by Beverly Hills Real Estate Holdings, LLC, 1141 Summit Drive, LLC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 27, 2022 Filing 76 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #55 filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah.(Merryman, Bryan)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. A settlement conference will be held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson as a video telephonic conference via Zoom on Friday, September 16, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 27, 2022 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by claimant Blue Orchid Financial LLC, (Richards, Ronald)
July 27, 2022 Filing 73 VICTOR NOVAL, 8484 WILSHIRE BLVD, LLC, BEVERLY HILLS REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC, 1141 SUMMIT DRIVE, LLC, BEVERLY HILLS EXOTIC COLLECTION, LLC and SECURED CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by claimant Franco Noval, (Richards, Ronald)
July 27, 2022 Filing 72 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #55 filed by claimant Blue Orchid Financial LLC.(Richards, Ronald)
July 27, 2022 Filing 71 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #55 with JURY DEMAND 8484 WILSHIRE BLVD, LLC, BEVERLY HILLS REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC, 1141 SUMMIT DRIVE, LLC, BEVERLY HILLS EXOTIC COLLECTION, LLC, AND SECURED CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLCS filed by claimant Franco Noval.(Attorney Ronald N. Richards added to party Franco Noval(pty:clm))(Richards, Ronald)
July 27, 2022 Filing 70 CLAIM filed by claimant Franco Noval. (Richards, Ronald)
July 26, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #66 , Claim #67 , Claim #65 , Claim #64 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. the docket entry for document no. 64 indicates that the Claim is made on behalf of Franco Noval and Rexford Trust. Instead, the Claim of Beverly Hills Exotic Collection, LLC is attached to document nos. 64 and 66. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 25, 2022 Filing 77 MINUTES OF Zoom Further Status Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel, as stated on the record. The Court is in receipt of the Joint Request for ADR Procedures filed 7/22/2022 #68 . The Court grants the Joint Request and refers the matter to the Magistrate Judge assigned to this action for settlement purposes, subject to her availability. A separate order will issue. Counsel shall check with Magistrate Judge Stevenson regarding her availability forthwith. Thereafter, counsel shall informally notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Catherine Jeang, by email if Magistrate Judge Stevenson is available to mediate this matter and when. The Court sets a Status Conference re: Settlement on 9/26/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder, by Zoom. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's Website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
July 22, 2022 Filing 68 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Hon. Karen L. Stevenson for settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Boyle, Daniel)
July 22, 2022 Filing 67 CLAIM filed by claimant Secured Capital Partners LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
July 22, 2022 Filing 66 CLAIM filed by claimant Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
July 22, 2022 Filing 65 CLAIM filed by claimant Blue Orchid Financial LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
July 22, 2022 Filing 64 CLAIM filed by claimant Franco Noval, Rexford Trust. (Richards, Ronald)
July 21, 2022 Filing 63 Notice of Verified Consolidated Claim of Khaled J. Al-Sabah Individually and as Trustee of the Awal Trust Dated February 23 2012 filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Merryman, Bryan)
July 18, 2022 Filing 62 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re: MINUTES OF ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE #53 . The 7/25/2022 Further Status Conference at 11:00 AM will be held by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 12, 2022 Filing 61 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 5/23/2022 and 5/24/2022 upon Defendant Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California last date of publication 6/21/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.com. (Boyle, Daniel)
June 27, 2022 Filing 60 CLAIM filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Dill, Matthew)
June 27, 2022 Filing 59 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #55 ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Dill, Matthew)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER CONSOLIDATED MASTER VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE, #55 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Pursuant to the Parties stipulation and for good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that the Claimants time to file answers and otherwise respond to the Master Complaint is hereby extended from June 27, 2022, to and including July 27, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 57 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Consolidated Complaint #55 filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Merryman, Bryan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 56 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Garth Dill counsel for Claimant County of Los Angeles. Adding Matthew Garth Dill as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimant Los Angeles County. (Attorney Matthew Garth Dill added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:clm))(Dill, Matthew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 55 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT related to: #1 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), filed by Plaintiff United States of America(Boyle, Daniel)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES #52 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. THEREFORE, FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWING: (1) The following actions are hereby consolidated into United States v. Real Property in Los Angeles, California, 2:20-cv-6314-CAS-KSx pursuant to FRCP 42: (a) United States v. Real Property in Los Angeles, California, 2:20-cv-6316-CAS-KSx; (b) United States v. Real Property in Beverly Hills, California, 2:20-cv-6318-CAS-KSx; (c) United States v. Real Property in Beverly Hills, California, 2:20-cv-6319-CAS-KSx; (d) United States v. Real Property in Beverly Hills, California, 2:20-cv-6320-CAS-KSx; (e) United States v. One British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A Aircraft Bearing Registration Number N716BB, et al, 2:20-cv-6321-CAS-KSx; (f) United States of America v. 762,201.48 Seized From U.S. Bank Account No. 8773 et al, 2:21-cv-01829-CASKSx; and (g) United States of America v. Real Property Located In Los Angeles, California, 2:21-cv-01832-CAS-KSx. (2) The United States shall file an amended and Consolidated Master Verified Complaint for forfeiture no later than 5/9/2022. (3) All claims filed in the Actions shall be deemed applied to the CMVC. (4) Pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(5)(b) of the FRCP, all Claimants shall file an answer to the CMVC no later than 6/27/2022. (jp)
March 21, 2022 Filing 53 MINUTES OF ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held by Zoom. The Court hereby grants the parties request to lift the stay of proceedings in case nos. 2:20cv06314; 2:20cv06316; 2:20cv06318; 2:20cv06319; 2:20cv06320; and 2:20cv06321. Further, the Court includes case nos. 2:21cv01829 and 2:21cv01832 in this Status Conference. The Court grants the government's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Leave to File a Consolidated Master Complaint for Forfeiture filed on 3/18/2022 [2:20cv6314 #52 ; 2:20cv6316 56 ; 2:20cv6318 #53 ; 2:20cv6319 #52 ; 2:20cv6320 #53 ; 2:20cv6321 57 ; 2:21cv1829 #22 ; and 2:21cv1832 #22 ]. The above referenced actions are hereby consolidated and the government shall file a Master Amended Complaint on or before 5/9/2022. Defendants/Claimants shall file their response on or before 6/27/2022. The Court sets a Further Status Conference on 7/25/2022 at 11:00 AM. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (jp)
March 18, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to CV 20-6316; CV 20-6318; CV 20-6319; CV 20-6320; CV 20-6321; CV 21-1829; and CV 21-1832, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyle, Daniel)
March 17, 2022 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan A. Merryman counsel for Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. Adding Bryan A. Merryman as counsel of record for Khaled J. Al-Sabah for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al-Sabah. (Attorney Bryan A. Merryman added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Merryman, Bryan)
March 15, 2022 Filing 50 STATEMENT for Status Conference filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah (Levin, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Filing 49 (IN CHAMBERS) - STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST TO LIFT STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (Filed February 24, 2022) 2:20cv06314 #48 ; 2:20cv06316 #52 ; 2:20cv06318 #49 ; 2:20cv06319[48; 2:20cv06320 #49 ; and 2:20cv06321 #53 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of the Status Report and Request to Lift Stay of Proceedings filed February 24, 2022, in the above-referenced related actions. The Court sets a Zoom Status Conference on March 21, 2022, at 11:00 A.M. and will be held by Zoom. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. (shb)
February 24, 2022 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST TO LIFT STAY OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
February 14, 2022 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT Fourth Status Report filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Levin, Daniel)
October 20, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT RE: STAY filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT THIRD STATUS REPORT filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Levin, Daniel)
June 30, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT RE: STAY filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 41 STATUS REPORT OF CLAIMANT KHALED J. AL-SABAH filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Levin, Daniel)
March 2, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT RE: STAY filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
February 24, 2021 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT OF CLAIMANT KHALED J. AL-SABAH filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Levin, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Claimaint County of Los Angeles, identifying County of Los Angeles. (Collins, Susan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Susan Titus Collins on behalf of Claimant County of Los Angeles (Attorney Susan Titus Collins added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:clm))(Collins, Susan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 35 CLAIM filed by Claimant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Collins, Susan)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING CASE #33 y Judge Christina A. Snyder. The request to stay this action is GRANTED. The government will file an in camera status report every 120 days regarding the status of the Related Investigation. If the Related Investigation is completed before a status report is due, the government will notify the court within 30 days of the completion of the Related Investigation. Claimant al-Sabah will file and serve a status report every 120 days regarding any investigation in Kuwait implicated by this action, unless and until this stay is lifted, or the parties stipulate otherwise. See order for details. (lom)
October 30, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Civil Forfeiture Cases filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #31 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel B Levin for Khaled J. Al Sabah. Attorney Wayne R Gross and Kevin D Lloyd terminated. (shb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Kevin D. Lloyd as counsel of record filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Lloyd, Kevin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel B Levin on behalf of Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah (Attorney Daniel B Levin added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Levin, Daniel)
October 16, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #28 , Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah.(Lloyd, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC.(Richards, Ronald)
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin D Lloyd counsel for Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. Adding Kevin D. Lloyd as counsel of record for Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimant Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attorney Kevin D Lloyd added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Lloyd, Kevin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 CLAIM filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gross, Wayne)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 Notice and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah, (Attorney Wayne R Gross added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Gross, Wayne)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 CLAIM filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Gross, Wayne)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel G Boyle counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Michael R. Sew Hoy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC, identifying 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim by 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 CLAIM filed by claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ronald N Richards on behalf of Claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC (Attorney Ronald N Richards added to party 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC(pty:clm))(Richards, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 7/27/2020 and 7/28/2020 upon Defendant Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California last date of publication 8/25/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN RE: POST AND WALK filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Boyle, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 by plaintiff USA. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Lis Pendens Notice. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF GOVERNMENT'S FILING OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS AS TO REAL PROPERTY LOCATED IN LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyle, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-01518 CAS. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06314 CAS(KSx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Christina A. Snyder, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-01518 CAS (rn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Michael R. Sew Hoy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Granting Ex Parte Appointing Internal Revenue Service as substitute custodian in place of the U.S. Marshall Service #5 . See Order for specifics. (et)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): No. CV 20-6313; No. CV 20-6316; No. CV 20-6318; No. CV 20-6319; No. CV 20-6320; and No. CV 20-6321 (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for APPOINTING INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT MEMO filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on July 16, 2020, was pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. began receiving civil matters. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Daniel G Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel G Boyle
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Represented By: Daniel G. Boyle
Represented By: Alexander Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Represented By: Ronald N. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Khaled J. Al Sabah
Represented By: Daniel B Levin
Represented By: Kevin D. Lloyd
Represented By: Wayne R. Gross
Represented By: Kevin D Lloyd
Represented By: Bryan A. Merryman
Represented By: Patrick William Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Susan Titus Collins
Represented By: Matthew Garth Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Franco Noval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rexford Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Blue Orchid Financial LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Represented By: Ronald N. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Represented By: Ronald N. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Secured Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Represented By: Ronald N. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Victor Franco Noval
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Represented By: Ronald N. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?