United States of America v. Real Property Located in Beverly Hills, California
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located in Beverly Hills, California
Claimant: Victor Franco Noval, County of Los Angeles and Khaled J. Al Sabah
Case Number: 2:2020cv06319
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT RE: STAY filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 41 STATUS REPORT OF CLAIMANT KHALED J. AL-SABAH filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Levin, Daniel)
March 2, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT RE: STAY filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
February 24, 2021 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT OF CLAIMANT KHALED J. AL-SABAH filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Levin, Daniel)
January 12, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Claimaint County of Los Angeles, identifying County of Los Angeles. (Collins, Susan)
January 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Susan Titus Collins on behalf of Claimant County of Los Angeles (Attorney Susan Titus Collins added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:clm))(Collins, Susan)
January 12, 2021 Filing 35 CLAIM filed by Claimant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Collins, Susan)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING CASE #33 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The request to stay this action is GRANTED. The government will file an in camera status report every 120 days regarding the status of the Related Investigation. If the Related Investigation is completed before a status report is due, the government will notify the court within 30 days of the completion of the Related Investigation. Claimant al-Sabah will file and serve a status report every 120 days regarding any investigation in Kuwait implicated by this action, unless and until this stay is lifted, or the parties stipulate otherwise. See order for details. (lom)
October 30, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Civil Forfeiture Cases filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #31 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel B Levin in place and instead of Wayne R. Gross and Kelvin D. Lloyd for Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. Daniel B Levin for Khaled J. Al Sabah. (shb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Kevin D. Lloyd as counsel of record filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Lloyd, Kevin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel B Levin on behalf of Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah (Attorney Daniel B Levin added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Levin, Daniel)
October 16, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #27 , Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah.(Lloyd, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by claimant Victor Franco Noval.(Richards, Ronald)
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin D Lloyd counsel for Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. Adding Kevin D. Lloyd as counsel of record for Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attorney Kevin D Lloyd added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Lloyd, Kevin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 CLAIM filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gross, Wayne)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 Notice and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah, (Attorney Wayne R Gross added to party Khaled J. Al Sabah(pty:clm))(Gross, Wayne)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 CLAIM filed by Claimant Khaled J. Al Sabah. (Gross, Wayne)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel G Boyle counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Michael R. Sew Hoy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying Victor Franco Noval, individually and as Trustee for the Rexford Trust. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #18 by Victor Franco Noval. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 7/27/2020 and 7/28/2020 upon Defendant Real Property Located in Beverly Hills, California last date of publication 8/25/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 CLAIM filed by claimant Victor Franco Noval. (Richards, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ronald N Richards on behalf of Claimant Victor Franco Noval (Attorney Ronald N Richards added to party Victor Franco Noval(pty:clm))(Richards, Ronald)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-01518 CAS. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06319 CAS(KSx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 WRIT OF ENTRY (DKT. #11 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt as follows: The United States, its agents, and representatives are authorized to enter the premises at 1124 Marilyn Drive, Beverly Hills, California for the purpose of conducting an inspection, inventory, and appraisal of the same property. (See Order for further specifics). (jp)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Christina A. Snyder, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-01518 CAS (rn)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Boyle, Daniel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Writ of of Entry filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Writ) (Boyle, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order #5 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Michael R. Sew Hoy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): No. CV 20-6313; No. CV 20-6314; No. CV 20-6316; No. CV 20-6318; No. CV 20-6320; and No. CV 20-6321 (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 **WITHDRAWN** EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for APPOINTING INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyle, Daniel) Modified on 7/20/2020 (cw).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT MEMO filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on July 16, 2020, was pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. began receiving civil matters. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Daniel G Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located in Beverly Hills, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located in Beverly Hills, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel G Boyle
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Victor Franco Noval
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Susan Titus Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Khaled J. Al Sabah
Represented By: Daniel B Levin
Represented By: Kevin D. Lloyd
Represented By: Wayne R. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?