United States of America v. One British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A Aircraft Bearing Registration Number N716BB, ET AL
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ONE BRITISH AEROSPACE BAE 125 SERIES 800A AIRCRAFT BEARING REGISTRATION NUMBER N716BB, ET AL and One British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A Aircraft Bearing Registration Number N716BB
Claimant: Secured Capital Partners, LLC, Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC and Victor Franco Noval
Case Number: 2:2020cv06321
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel G Boyle counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Michael R. Sew Hoy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by claimants Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC, Victor Franco Noval, identifying Victor Franco Noval, individually and as Trustee for the Rexford Trust, Secured Capital Partners LLC, Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 27 CLAIM filed by claimant Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 CLAIM filed by claimant Secured Capital Partners, LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 CLAIM filed by claimant Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC, Victor Franco Noval. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ronald N Richards on behalf of Claimants Victor Franco Noval, Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC (Attorney Ronald N Richards added to party Victor Franco Noval(pty:clm), Attorney Ronald N Richards added to party Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC(pty:clm))(Richards, Ronald)
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN RE: SEIZURE OF MANNY PACQUIAO MEMORABILIA filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Boyle, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-01518 CAS. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06321 CAS(KSx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Christina A. Snyder, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-01518 CAS (rn)
July 26, 2020 Filing 20 CORRECTED WARRANT IN REM as to All right and title to assorted Manny Pacquiao memorabilia issued. (mrgo)
July 26, 2020 Filing 19 CORRECTED WARRANT IN REM as to one British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A aircraft issued. (mrgo)
July 26, 2020 Filing 18 CORRECTED WARRANT IN REM as to Hertz Investment Group Midwest Office Portfolio issued. (mrgo)
July 26, 2020 Filing 17 CORRECTED WARRANT IN REM as to one 2011 Azimut 68' 68S Yacht, bearing hull issued. (mrgo)
July 26, 2020 Filing 16 CORRECTED WARRANT IN REM as to All right and title to one 2014 Lamborghini Aventador automobile issued. (mrgo)
July 26, 2020 Filing 15 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Issued as to All right and title to one 2014 Lamborghini Aventador automobile. (mrgo) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mrgo).
July 26, 2020 Filing 14 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Issued as to one 2011 Azimut 68' 68S Yacht. (mrgo) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mrgo).
July 26, 2020 Filing 13 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Issued as to one British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A aircraft. (mrgo) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mrgo).
July 26, 2020 Filing 12 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Issued as to Hertz Investment Group Midwest Office Portfolio. (mrgo) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mrgo).
July 26, 2020 Filing 11 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Issued as to Manny Pacquiao memorabilia. (mrgo) Modified on 7/27/2020 (mrgo).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (see document for further details) (et)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Michael R. Sew Hoy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Sew Hoy, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): No. CV 20-6313; No. CV 20-6314; No. CV 20-6316; No. CV 20-6318; No. CV 20-6319; and No. CV 20-6320 (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ISSUANCE OF WARRANTS FOR ARREST IN REM filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order) (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT MEMO filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on July 16, 2020, was pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. began receiving civil matters. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Daniel G Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A Aircraft Bearing Registration Number N716BB, ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE BRITISH AEROSPACE BAE 125 SERIES 800A AIRCRAFT BEARING REGISTRATION NUMBER N716BB, ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One British Aerospace BAE125 Series 800A Aircraft Bearing Registration Number N716BB
Represented By: Dana M Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel G Boyle
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Secured Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Beverly Hills Exotic Collection LLC
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Victor Franco Noval
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Represented By: Dana M Cole
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?