Stephanie Harvey v. Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Harvey
Defendant: Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc. and DOES 1 to 20, inclusive
Petitioner: SF Markets, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06362
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Complaint filed by SF Markets, LLC Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc..(Bradley, Lindy)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Harvey Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/21/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC, identifying Sprouts Farms Markets Holdings, LLC and Sprouts Farmers Markets, Inc.. (Bradley, Lindy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant SF Markets, LLC. (Bradley, Lindy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV07032 Receipt No: ACACDC-27250292 - Fee: $400, filed by SF Markets, LLC SF Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Attorney Lindy F Bradley added to party SF Markets, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Bradley, Lindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephanie Harvey v. Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Harvey
Represented By: Alexander M Polyachenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SF Markets, LLC
Represented By: Lindy F Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc.
Represented By: Lindy F Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?