James Jancales et al v. HD Supply Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Jancales and Robert Vose
Defendant: HD Supply Inc, HD Supply Management, Inc., HD Supply, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06366
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A scheduling conference has been placed on calendar for December 14, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. See order for details. (lom)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant HD Supply Management, Inc..(Krauthamer, Danielle)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant HD Supply, Inc..(Krauthamer, Danielle)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 Text Only Entry: The Court has reviewed the Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint #11 filed on August 4, 2020. Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall immediately file proof of service of the summons and complaint. Proof of service must be filed within 5 days of service. See Standing Order #10 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to HD Supply Management, Inc. answer now due 8/25/2020; HD Supply, Inc. answer now due 8/25/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants HD Supply Management, Inc.; HD Supply, Inc..(Attorney Danielle Samantha Krauthamer added to party HD Supply Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle Samantha Krauthamer added to party HD Supply, Inc.(pty:dft))(Krauthamer, Danielle)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-07924 RGK(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06366 RGK(PJWx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (rn)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants HD Supply Management, Inc., HD Supply, Inc. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs James Jancales, Robert Vose, (Shem-Tov, Shalem)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James Jancales, Robert Vose. (Shem-Tov, Shalem)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs James Jancales, Robert Vose. (Shem-Tov, Shalem)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27250844 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs James Jancales, Robert Vose. (Attorney Shalem Shem-Tov added to party James Jancales(pty:pla), Attorney Shalem Shem-Tov added to party Robert Vose (pty:pla))(Shem-Tov, Shalem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Jancales et al v. HD Supply Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jancales
Represented By: Shalem Shem-Tov
Represented By: Raviv Netzah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vose
Represented By: Shalem Shem-Tov
Represented By: Raviv Netzah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Supply Management, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Samantha Krauthamer
Represented By: Todd B Scherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Samantha Krauthamer
Represented By: Todd B Scherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?