Antiwan Lavar Cole v. Winco Foods Foundation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antiwan Lavar Cole
Defendant: Winco Foods, LLC, Winco Foods Foundation, Inc., Winco Holdings Inc and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06373
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #15 filed by Defendants WinCo Foods, LLC, Winco Holdings Inc.(Attorney Phillip Allan Trajan Perez added to party Winco Holdings Inc(pty:dft))(Perez, Phillip)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Defendants WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc., WinCo Foods, LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #16 RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT (Perez, Phillip)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Lee Garcia counsel for Plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. Christopher L. Garcia is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. (Garcia, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge George H. Wu. Defendants have failed to allege the citizenship of the members of WinCo LLC. As such, the Court orders defendants to file a response to this Order to Show Cause by 12:00 p.m. on September 8, 2020, delineating each and every member of WinCo LLC and the respective citizenships of each and every member. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does, WinCo Foods, LLC, Winco Holdings Inc; Party WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc. (an Idaho Corporation) terminated; amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. (mrgo)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Leave #12 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend his First Amended Complaint, a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit "A."IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Defendant's responsive pleading shall be due thirty (30) days after the FAC is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the FAC is deemed filed as of the date this Order is signed. (mrgo)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the August 27, 2020, scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: (Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2020. Discovery cut-off 3/26/2021. Last day to hear Motions is 5/24/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Huang, Shani)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. (Garcia, Christopher)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc., WinCo Foods, LLC.(Perez, Phillip)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Lee Garcia counsel for Plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. Adding Christopher L. Garcia as counsel of record for Antiwan Lavar Cole for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. (Attorney Christopher Lee Garcia added to party Antiwan Lavar Cole(pty:pla))(Garcia, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (mrgo)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc., WinCo Foods, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Antiwan Lavar Cole. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Winco Foods Foundation, Inc., Winco Foods, LLC, identifying Antiwan Lavar Cole, WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc., WinCo Foods, LLC, WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Perez, Phillip)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Winco Foods Foundation, Inc., Winco Foods, LLC. (Perez, Phillip)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Deborah Hopkins re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Winco Foods Foundation, Inc., Winco Foods, LLC. (Perez, Phillip)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV22232 Receipt No: ACACDC-27254061 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Winco Foods Foundation, Inc., Winco Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Phillip Allan Trajan Perez added to party Winco Foods Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip Allan Trajan Perez added to party Winco Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Perez, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antiwan Lavar Cole v. Winco Foods Foundation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antiwan Lavar Cole
Represented By: Seung Lyun Yang
Represented By: Shani Kupferman Huang
Represented By: Christopher Lee Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Foods, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Represented By: Julianne Michelle Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Foods Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Represented By: Julianne Michelle Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Holdings Inc
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?